California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB180 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/22/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 180AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2015 INTRODUCED BY  Committee on Business and Professions   (   Assembly Members Bonilla (Chair), Bloom, Dodd, Gatto, Holden, Mullin, Ting, and Wood   )   Assembly Member   Bonilla   (   Coauthor:   Senator   Hill   )  JANUARY 26, 2015 An act to amend Section 9625  of   of, and to amend and repeal Section 9613 of,  the Business and Professions Code, relating to cemeteries. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 180, as amended,  Committee on Business and Professions   Bonilla  . Cemetery and Funeral Bureau. The Cemetery Act provides for the licensure and regulation of cemeteries, crematories, and their personnel by the Cemetery and Funeral  Bureau that   Bureau, which  is within the Department of Consumer Affairs. The act authorizes the Director of Consumer Affairs with the approval of the Director of Finance to appoint a chief of the bureau who is vested with the duty to enforce the act and serves at the pleasure of the director.  The act also required the bureau to survey each of its licensees to obtain information to determine if the endowment care fund levels of the licensee's cemetery are sufficient to cover the cost   of future operation, as specified, and report its findings and recommendations to the Legislature by January 1, 2008.  This bill would provide that the powers and duties of the bureau under the act are subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature and that the review is required to be performed as if the act is scheduled to be repealed on January 1, 2020.  The bill would require the bureau to conduct a study to obtain information to determine if the endowment care fund levels of its licensees' cemeteries are sufficient to cover the cost of future operation, as specified, and report its findings and recommendations to the Senate Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development and the Assembly Committee on Business and Professions by November 1, 2018. The bill would repeal that reporting requirement on January 1, 2020.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 9613 of the   Business and Professions Code  is amended to read:  9613. (a) The bureau shall  survey each of its licensees   conduct a study  to obtain information to determine if the endowment care fund levels of  the   each  licensee's cemetery are sufficient to cover the cost of future operation. The bureau shall also review the levels of endowment care funds that have previously been reported pursuant to this chapter by licensed cemeteries. (b) The bureau shall report its findings and recommendations to the  Legislature by January 1, 2008.   Senate Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development and the Assembly Committee on Business and Professions by November 1, 2018.   (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2020, and as of that date is repealed.   SECTION 1.   SEC. 2.  Section 9625 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 9625. (a) There is in the department, the Cemetery and Funeral Bureau, under the supervision and control of the director. (b) The director may appoint a chief at a salary to be fixed and determined by the director, with the approval of the Director of Finance. The duty of enforcing and administering this chapter is vested in the chief, and he or she is responsible to the director therefor. The chief shall serve at the pleasure of the director. (c) Notwithstanding any other law, the powers and duties of the bureau, as set forth in this chapter, shall be subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature. The review shall be performed as if this chapter were scheduled to be repealed on January 1, 2020.