BILL NUMBER: AB 1813ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 30, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Frazier FEBRUARY 8, 2016 An act to amend Sections 185020 and 185022 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to high-speed rail. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1813, Frazier. High-Speed Rail Authority: membership. Existing law creates the High-Speed Rail Authority with specified powers and duties relative to development and implementation of a high-speed train system. The authority is composed of 9 members, including 5 members appointed by the Governor, and 2 members each appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules and the Speaker of the Assembly. This bill would additionally provide for appointment of one Member of the Senate by the Senate Committee on Rules and one Member of the Assembly by the Speaker of the Assembly to serve as ex officio members of the authority. The bill would provide that the ex officio members shall participate in the activities of the authority to the extent that participation is not incompatible with their positions as Members of the Legislature. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 185020 of the Public Utilities Code is amended to read: 185020. (a) There is in the Transportation Agency a High-Speed Rail Authority. (b) (1) The authority is composed of 11 members as follows: (A) Five members appointed by the Governor. (B) Two members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. (C) Two members appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly. (D) One Member of the Senate appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules and one Member of the Assembly appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly shall be ex officio members without vote and shall participate in the activities of the authority to the extent that participation is not incompatible with their positions as Members of the Legislature. (2) For the purposes of making appointments to the authority pursuant to subparagraphs (A), (B), and (C) of paragraph (1), the Governor, the Senate Committee on Rules, and the Speaker of the Assembly shall take into consideration geographical diversity to ensure that all regions of the state are adequately represented. (c) Except as provided in subdivision (d), and until their successors are appointed, members of the authority, other than ex officio members, shall hold office for terms of four years. A vacancy shall be filled by the appointing power making the original appointment, by appointing a member to serve the remainder of the term. (d) (1) On and after January 1, 2001, the terms of all persons who are then members of the authority shall expire, but those members may continue to serve until they are reappointed or until their successors are appointed. In order to provide for evenly staggered terms, persons appointed or reappointed to the authority after January 1, 2001, shall be appointed to initial terms to expire as follows: (A) Of the five persons appointed by the Governor, one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2002, one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2003, one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2004, and two shall be appointed to terms which expires on December 31, 2005. (B) Of the two persons appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules, one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2002, and one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2004. (C) Of the two persons appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly, one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2003, and one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2005. (2) Following expiration of each of the initial terms provided for in this subdivision, the term shall expire every four years thereafter on December 31. (e) Members of the authority are subject to the Political Reform Act of 1974 (Title 9 (commencing with Section 81000)). (f) From among its voting members, the authority shall elect a chairperson, who shall preside at all meetings of the authority, and a vice chairperson to preside in the absence of the chairperson. The chairperson shall serve a term of one year. (g) Five voting members of the authority constitute a quorum for taking any action by the authority. SEC. 2. Section 185022 of the Public Utilities Code is amended to read: 185022. (a) Each voting member of the authority shall receive compensation of one hundred dollars ($100) for each day that the member is attending to the business of the authority, but shall not receive more than five hundred dollars ($500) in any calendar month. (b) Voting members of the authority shall be reimbursed for their actual travel expenses incurred in attending to the business of the authority.