California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1887 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/30/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1887AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 30, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 10, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Low (  Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Ting   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Chiu   and Ting  ) FEBRUARY 11, 2016 An act to add Section 11139.8 to the Government Code, relating to discrimination. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1887, as amended, Low. State government: discrimination: travel. Existing law prohibits discrimination on the basis of race, national origin, ethnic group identification, religion, age, sex, sexual orientation, color, genetic information, or disability under any state program or activity. Existing law provides for officers and employees of the state, when away from their headquarters for state business, to receive travel expenses. This bill would prohibit a state agency  and the Legislature  from requiring any of its employees, officers, or members to travel  to any state with a law in effect that sanctions or requires discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation, gender identity, or gender expression,   to,  or approving a request for state-funded or state-sponsored travel  to   to,  any state  with a law in effect that sanctions   that,   after June 26, 2015, has enacted a law that voids or repeals existing state or local protections against discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation, gender identity, or gender expression   or has enacted a law that authorizes  or requires discrimination  against same-sex couples or their families or  on the basis of sexual orientation, gender identity, or gender expression,  as specified,  subject to specified exceptions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 11139.8 is added to the Government Code, to read: 11139.8. (a) The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (1) California is a leader in protecting civil rights and preventing discrimination. (2) California's robust nondiscrimination laws include protections on the basis of sexual orientation, gender identity, and gender expression, among other characteristics. (3) Religious freedom is a cornerstone of law and public policy in the United States, and the Legislature strongly supports and affirms this important freedom. (4) The exercise of religious freedom should not be a justification for discrimination. (5) California must take action to avoid supporting or financing discrimination against lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender people. (6) It is the policy of the State of California to promote fairness and equality and to combat discrimination. (b)  An   A state  agency, department, board, authority, or commission, including an agency, department, board, authority, or commission of the University of California, the Board of Regents of the University of California, or the California State  University   University, and the Legislature  shall not do either of the following: (1) Require any of its employees, officers, or members to travel to a state  with a law in effect that sanctions   that, after June 26, 2015, has enacted a law that voids or repeals existing state or local protections against discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation, gender identity, or gender expression   or has enacted a law   that authorizes  or requires discrimination  against same-sex couples or their families or  on the basis of sexual orientation, gender identity, or gender  expression.   expression, including any law that creates an exemption to antidiscrimination laws in order to permit discrimination against same-sex couples or their families or on the basis of sexual orientation, gender identity, or gender expression.  (2) Approve a request for state-funded or state-sponsored travel to a state  with a law in effect that sanctions   that, after June 26, 2015, has enacted a law that voids or repeals existing state or local protections against discrimination on the   basis of sexual orientation, gender identity, or gender expression, or has enacted a law   that authorizes  or requires discrimination  against same-sex couples or their families or  on the basis of sexual orientation, gender identity, or gender  expression.   expression, including any law that creates an exemption to antidiscrimination laws in order to permit discrimination against same-sex couples or their families or on the basis of sexual orientation, gender identity, or gender expression.  (c) Subdivision (b) shall not apply to travel that is necessary for the enforcement of California law, to meet  prior  contractual  obligations,   obligations incurred before January 1, 2017,  or for the protection of public health, welfare, or safety. (d) The prohibition on state-funded travel described in this section shall continue while any law specified in subdivision (b) remains in effect.