BILL NUMBER: AB 19AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 23, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 16, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chang ( Coauthor: Assembly Member Olsen ) ( Coauthor: Senator Huff ) DECEMBER 1, 2014 An act to add and repeal Section 12098.2toof the Government Code, relating to economic development. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 19, as amended, Chang. Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development: small business: regulations. Existing law creates the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development to exercise various powers, including, among others, making recommendations to the Governor and the Legislature regarding policies, programs, and actions to advance statewide economic goals. Existing law establishes the Office of Small Business Advocate, within the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development, that is headed by the Director of the Office of Small Business Advocate who is also referred to as the Small Business Advocate. This bill would require the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development, under the direction of the advocate, to reviewallregulations affecting small businesses adopted prior to January 1, 2016,in orderto determine whether the regulations need to be amended in order to become more effective, less burdensome, or to decrease the cost impact to affected sectors. The bill would require the office to submit the results of its review, including its conclusions and recommendations, to the agency with jurisdiction over the regulations and to provide public access to this information on its Internet Web site. The bill would also require the office to report to the Legislature and the Governor prior to January 1, 2021, and would repeal all of these requirements on January 1, 2021. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12098.2 is added to the Government Code, to read: 12098.2. (a) The Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development, under the direction of the advocate, shall reviewallregulations affecting small businesses adopted prior to January 1, 2016,in orderto determine whether the regulations need to be amended in order to become more effective, less burdensome, or to decrease the cost impact to affected sectors. (b) The office shall establish a process through which stakeholders may request that a regulation be reviewed by the office. The office shall establish a priority review process and shall determine whether a regulation identified pursuant to this subdivision is suitable for priority review. (c) The office shall determine whether the regulation presents problems, as set forth in subdivision (a), and shall identify proposed remedies. Upon completion of the review, the office shall submit the results of its review, including its conclusions and recommendations, to the agency with jurisdiction over the regulations and shall provide public access to this information on its Internet Web site. (d) Notwithstanding any law, the office shall report to the Legislature and the Governor prior to January 1, 2021. The report shall include a listing of all regulations reviewed, the results of each review including the remedies the office proposed, and a description of the actions taken by the responsible agency. The report shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795. (e) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2021, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2021, deletes or extends that date.