California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1903 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/04/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1903AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 4, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wilk FEBRUARY 11, 2016 An act to add and repeal Section 911.3 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to natural gas. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1903, as amended, Wilk. Aliso Canyon gas leak: health impact study. Under existing law, the Public Utilities Commission has regulatory authority over public utilities, including gas corporations. The Natural Gas Pipeline Safety Act of 2011, within the Public Utilities Act, designates the commission as the state authority responsible for regulating and enforcing federal law with respect to intrastate gas pipeline transportation and pipeline facilities.  Existing law provides for the administration of various programs addressing public health by the State Department of Public Health.   Existing law requires the Office of Environmental Health Hazard Assessment to evaluate the environmental and health risks posed by various substances.  This bill would require the commission  and the department  to  jointly   authorize a  study  by the Office of Environmental Health Hazard Assessment of  the long-term health impacts of the significant natural gas leak from the Aliso Canyon natural gas storage facility located in the County of Los Angeles that started approximately October 23, 2015, as specified. The bill would require the commission to  publish and transmit the  report  by the Office of Environmental Health Hazard Assessment and  its ongoing findings to the  appropriate policy committees of the  Legislature on a biennial basis, on or before January 1 of every even-numbered year, from 2018 until  2032.   2028. The bill would require the commission, consistent with its authority to bring enforcement actions, to order Southern California Gas Company to pay for the study. The bill would require the commission to prohibit Southern California Gas Company from recovering any of those costs   in any rate approved by the commission.   The bill would repeal these provisions on January 1, 2029.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 911.3 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 911.3. (a) The commission  and the State Department of Public Health shall  jointly   authorize a  study  by the Office of Environmental Health Hazard Assessment of  the long-term health impacts of the significant natural gas leak from the Aliso Canyon natural gas storage facility located in the County of Los Angeles that started approximately October 23, 2015. The study shall include, but is not limited to, both of the following: (1) An investigation of the impact of the natural  has   gas  leak on the health of persons who resided within a 12-mile radius of the Aliso Canyon natural gas storage facility in the County of Los Angeles between October 23, 2015, and  ____.   the date when the State Oil and Gas Supervisor has determined that the gas well safety review conducted pursuant to Order 1109, issued by the State Oil and Gas Supervisor on March 4, 2016, is complete.  (2) An evaluation of the impact on residents due to exposure to chemicals, including, but not limited to, methane, benzene, and mercaptan. (b)  (1)    The commission shall  publish and transmit the  report  by the Office of Environmental Health Hazard Assessment and  its ongoing findings to the  appropriate policy committees of the  Legislature on a biennial basis, on or before January 1 of every even-numbered year, from 2018 until  2032.   2028.   (2) The report shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.   (c) It is the intent of the Legislature that the study conducted pursuant to subdivision (a) should be paid for out of moneys collected from any penalties assessed against Southern California Gas Company pursuant to this part in regards to the natural gas leak at the Aliso Canyon natural gas storage facility located in the County of Los Angeles.   (c) (1) Consistent with its authority to bring enforcement actions under this part, the commission shall order Southern California Gas Company to pay for the study conducted pursuant to subdivision (a).   (2) The commission shall prohibit Southern California Gas Company from recovering any of the costs ordered to be paid pursuant to paragraph (1) in any rate approved by the commission.   (3) If the commission penalizes Southern California Gas Company for its responsibilities related to the natural gas leak at the Aliso Canyon Natural Gas Storage facility, the commission may include the costs of the study conducted pursuant to subdivision (a) in any penalty assessment.  (d) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1,  2033,   2029,  and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1,  2033,   2029,  deletes or extends that date.