California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1928 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/12/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1928INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Campos FEBRUARY 12, 2016 An act to amend Section 25401.9 of the Public Resources Code, relating to water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1928, as introduced, Campos. Water efficiency: landscape irrigation equipment. Existing law requires, to the extent that funds are available, the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, in consultation with the Department of Water Resources, to adopt, by January 1, 2010, performance standards and labeling requirements for landscape irrigation controllers and moisture sensors and, on or after January 1, 2012, prohibits that equipment from being sold unless it meets the performance standards and labeling requirements. This bill would postpone the date by which the commission is to adopt the performance standards and labeling requirements to January 1, 2018, and would prohibit, on and after January 1, 2020, the sale of that equipment unless it meets the performance standards and labeling requirements. The bill would additionally require the commission, in adopting those standards and requirements, to consider developments in landscape irrigation efficiency occurring on or after January 1, 2010. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25401.9 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 25401.9. (a) To the extent that funds are available, the commission, in consultation with the Department of Water  Resources,   Resources and in consideration of developments in landscape irrigation efficiency occurring on and after January 1, 2010,  shall adopt by regulation, after holding one or more public hearings, performance standards and labeling requirements for landscape irrigation equipment, including, but not limited to, irrigation controllers, moisture sensors, emission devices, and valves, for the purpose of reducing the wasteful, uneconomic, inefficient, or unnecessary consumption of energy or water. (b) For the purposes of complying with subdivision (a), the commission shall do both of the following: (1) Adopt performance standards and labeling requirements for landscape irrigation controllers and moisture sensors on or before January 1,  2010.   2018.  (2) Consider the Irrigation Association's Smart Water Application Technology Program testing protocols when adopting performance standards for landscape irrigation equipment, including, but not limited to, irrigation controllers, moisture sensors, emission devices, and valves. (c) On and after January 1,  2012,   2020,  an irrigation controller or moisture sensor for landscape irrigation uses may not be sold or installed in the state unless the controller or sensor meets the performance standards and labeling requirements established pursuant to this section.