California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1928 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/15/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1928AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 15, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Campos  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Gordon   )  FEBRUARY 12, 2016 An act to amend Section 25401.9 of the Public Resources Code, relating to water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1928, as amended, Campos. Water efficiency: landscape irrigation equipment. Existing law requires, to the extent that funds are available, the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, in consultation with the Department of Water Resources, to adopt, by January 1, 2010, performance standards and labeling requirements for landscape irrigation  controllers and moisture sensors   equipment  and, on or after January 1, 2012, prohibits that equipment from being sold unless it meets the performance standards and labeling requirements. This bill would postpone the date by which the commission is to adopt the performance standards and labeling requirements to January 1,  2018,   2019,  and would  prohibit, on and after January 1, 2020,   prohibit  the sale  or the offer for sale  of that equipment  manufactured on or after the effective date of the performance standards and labeling requirements  unless  it   the equipment  meets the performance standards and labeling  requirements.   requirements and is certified by the manufacturer as meeting the performance standards.  The bill would additionally require the commission, in adopting those standards and requirements, to consider developments in landscape irrigation efficiency occurring on or after January 1, 2010. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25401.9 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 25401.9. (a)  To   Pursuant   t   o subdivision (c) of Section 25402, to  the extent that funds are available, the commission, in consultation with the Department of Water Resources and in consideration of developments in landscape irrigation efficiency occurring on  and   or  after January 1, 2010, shall adopt by regulation,  after holding one or more public hearings,  performance standards and labeling requirements for landscape irrigation equipment, including, but not limited to, irrigation controllers, moisture sensors, emission devices, and  valves, for the purpose of reducing the wasteful, uneconomic, inefficient, or unnecessary consumption of energy or water.   valves.  (b) For the purposes of complying with subdivision (a), the commission shall do both of the following: (1) Adopt performance standards and labeling requirements for landscape irrigation  controllers and moisture sensors   equipment  on or before January 1,  2018.   2019.  (2) Consider the Irrigation Association's Smart Water Application Technology Program testing protocols when adopting performance standards for landscape irrigation equipment, including, but not limited to, irrigation controllers, moisture sensors, emission devices, and valves. (c)  On and after January 1, 2020, an irrigation controller or moisture sensor   No new irrigation   equipment  for landscape irrigation uses  may not   that is manufactured on or after the effective date of the regulations adopted pursuant to subdivision (a) shall  be sold or  installed   offered for sale  in the state unless the  controller or sensor   irrigation equipment  meets the performance standards and labeling requirements established pursuant to this  section.   section and is certified by the manufacturer as in compliance with those standards.