BILL NUMBER: AB 1928AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 15, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Campos ( Coauthor: Assembly Member Gordon ) FEBRUARY 12, 2016 An act to amend Section 25401.9 of the Public Resources Code, relating to water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1928, as amended, Campos. Water efficiency: landscape irrigation equipment. Existing law requires, to the extent that funds are available, the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, in consultation with the Department of Water Resources, to adopt, by January 1, 2010, performance standards and labeling requirements for landscape irrigationcontrollers and moisture sensorsequipment and, on or after January 1, 2012, prohibits that equipment from being sold unless it meets the performance standards and labeling requirements. This bill would postpone the date by which the commission is to adopt the performance standards and labeling requirements to January 1,2018,2019, and wouldprohibit, on and after January 1, 2020,prohibit the sale or the offer for sale of that equipment manufactured on or after the effective date of the performance standards and labeling requirements unlessitthe equipment meets the performance standards and labelingrequirements.requirements and is certified by the manufacturer as meeting the performance standards. The bill would additionally require the commission, in adopting those standards and requirements, to consider developments in landscape irrigation efficiency occurring on or after January 1, 2010. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25401.9 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 25401.9. (a)ToPursuant t o subdivision (c) of Section 25402, to the extent that funds are available, the commission, in consultation with the Department of Water Resources and in consideration of developments in landscape irrigation efficiency occurring onandor after January 1, 2010, shall adopt by regulation,after holding one or more public hearings,performance standards and labeling requirements for landscape irrigation equipment, including, but not limited to, irrigation controllers, moisture sensors, emission devices, andvalves, for the purpose of reducing the wasteful, uneconomic, inefficient, or unnecessary consumption of energy or water.valves. (b) For the purposes of complying with subdivision (a), the commission shall do both of the following: (1) Adopt performance standards and labeling requirements for landscape irrigationcontrollers and moisture sensorsequipment on or before January 1,2018.2019. (2) Consider the Irrigation Association's Smart Water Application Technology Program testing protocols when adopting performance standards for landscape irrigation equipment, including, but not limited to, irrigation controllers, moisture sensors, emission devices, and valves. (c)On and after January 1, 2020, an irrigation controller or moisture sensorNo new irrigation equipment for landscape irrigation usesmay notthat is manufactured on or after the effective date of the regulations adopted pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be sold orinstalledoffered for sale in the state unless thecontroller or sensorirrigation equipment meets the performance standards and labeling requirements established pursuant to thissection.section and is certified by the manufacturer as in compliance with those standards.