BILL NUMBER: AB 2105AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 12, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Rodriguez FEBRUARY 17, 2016 An act to amend Section 14017 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce development. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2105, as amended, Rodriguez. Workforcedevelopment.development: report: allied health care professionals. Existing law establishes the California Workforce Development Board as the body responsible for assisting the Governor in the development, oversight, and continuous improvement of California's workforce investment system and the alignment of the education and workforce investment systems to the needs of the 21st century economy and workforce. Existing law requires the board, among other things, to prepare and submit to the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature a report on the board's findings and recommendations regarding "earn and learn" job training opportunities, models, and programs. Under existing law, this reporting requirement is inoperative on January 1, 2019. This bill would extend that inoperative date to January 1, 2020. The bill would require the board to consider the recommendations in the report to determine whether the recommendations should be included within the board's work plan for the 2017- 18 fiscal year, contact, or delegate to another state entity to contact, Medicare and Medicaid Services to determine how these federal entities could become engaged in a cross-sector collaboration on expanding the use of apprenticeship programs to help prepare allied health care professionals to meet the needs of California businesses and the public, and approve the progress and outcomes of these activities as an agenda item. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:noyes . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14017 of the Unemployment Insurance Code is amended to read: 14017. (a) In efforts to expand job training and employment for allied health professions, the California Workforce Development Board, in consultation with the Division of Apprenticeship Standards, shall do the following: (1) Identify opportunities for "earn and learn" job training opportunities that meet the industry's workforce demands and that are in high-wage, high-demand jobs. (2) Identify and develop specific requirements and qualifications for entry into "earn and learn" job training models. (3) Establish standards for "earn and learn" job training programs that are outcome oriented and accountable. The standards shall measure the results from program participation, including a measurement of how many complete the program with an industry-recognized credential that certifies that the individual is ready to enter the specific allied health profession for which he or she has been trained. (4) Develop means to identify, assess, and prepare a pool of qualified candidates seeking to enter "earn and learn" job training models. (b) (1) The board, on or before December 1, 2015, shall prepare and submit to the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature a report on the findings and recommendations of the board. (2) The board shall consider the recommendations in the report to determine whether any or all of the recommendations should be included within the board's work plan for the 2017-18 fiscal year or referred to another state entity for possible action. At a minimum, the board shall contact, or shall delegate to another state entity to contact, Medicare and Medicaid Services to determine how these federal entities could become engaged in a cross-sector collaboration on expanding the use of apprenticeship programs to help prepare allied health care professionals to meet the needs of California businesses and the public. The board shall approve the progress and outcomes of these activities as an agenda item.(2)(3) The requirement for submitting a report imposed pursuant to this subdivision is inoperative on January 1, 2020.