California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2137 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/28/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2137AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 15, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Santiago FEBRUARY 17, 2016 An act to add  Article 1.3 (commencing with Section 92603) to Chapter 6 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of   and repeal Section 66721.9 of  the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2137, as amended, Santiago. Postsecondary education: University of California: student  transfer process.   transfers.  Existing law establishes the University of California, under the administration of the Regents of the University of California,  the California State University, under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University,  and the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as  the 3   2 of the  segments of public postsecondary education in this state.  Existing law provides that the Regents of the University of California, the Trustees of the California State University, and the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges shall have as a fundamental policy the maintenance of a healthy and expanded student transfer system.   Existing law requests the University of California to continue its examination of articulation of lower division major prerequisites in high-demand transfer majors with a goal of working in collaboration with the California Community Colleges to design community college transfer degrees that provide students adequate preparation for entry into a major. Existing law also requests the University of California to consider and impl   ement other specified actions to increase transfer between the university and the California Community Colleges.  This bill would request the regents to submit annual reports, on or before March 1 in each year from 2017 to 2020, inclusive, on the implementation of the recommendations of the Transfer Action Team convened by the President of the University of California. The bill would also request the regents to submit annual reports, on or before March 1 in each year from 2017 to 2022, inclusive, on specified topics relating to  the use of transfer pathways by   community college student transfers to the  University of  California students.   California.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 66721.9 is added to the   Education Code   , to read:   66721.9. (a) The regents are hereby requested to submit both of the following in accordance with Section 9795 of the Government Code: (1) An annual report to the Legislature, submitted on or before March 1 in each year from 2017 to 2020, inclusive, on the implementation of the recommendations of the Transfer Action Team convened by the President of the University of California in December 2013. (2) An annual report to the Legislature, submitted on or before March 1 in each year from 2017 to 2022, inclusive, on all of the following: (A) (i) The number of students with an associate degree for transfer who were granted admission to the University of California, along with the average community college grade point average of these students, broken down by University of California campus. (ii) The number of students with an associate degree for transfer who were denied admission to the University of California, along with the average community college grade point average of these students, broken down by University of California campus. (iii) The number of students described in clause (i) who enrolled at a University of California campus, and the number who graduated from the University of California within two or three academic years for the cohort graduating in the year of the report, broken down by University of California campus. (B) (i) The number of students who used the transfer pathway framework and who were granted admission to the University of California, along with the average community college grade point average of these students, broken down by University of California campus. (ii) The number of students who used the transfer pathway framework and who were denied admission to the University of California, along with the average community college grade point average of these students, broken down by University of California campus. (iii) The number of students described in clause (i) who enrolled at a University of California campus, and the number who graduated from the University of California within two or three academic years for the cohort graduating in the year of the report, broken down by University of California campus. (C) (i) The number of students who used the transfer admission guarantee and who were granted admission to the University of California, along with the average community college grade point average of these students, broken down by University of California campus. (ii) The number of students who used the transfer admission guarantee and who were denied admission to the University of California, along with the average community college grade point average of these students, broken down by University of California campus. (iii) The number of students described in clause (i) who enrolled at a University of California campus, and the number who graduated from the University of California within two or three academic years for the cohort graduating in the year of the report, broken down by University of California campus. (b) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2024.   SECTION 1.   Article 1.3 (commencing with Section 92603) is added to Chapter 6 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of the Education Code, to read: Article 1.3. Transfer Pathways 92603. The regents are hereby requested to submit both of the following in accordance with Section 9795 of the Government Code: (a) An annual report to the Legislature, submitted on or before March 1 in each year from 2017 to 2020, inclusive, on the implementation of the recommendations of the Transfer Action Team convened by the President of the University of California in December 2013. (b) An annual report to the Legislature, submitted on or before March in each year from 2017 to 2022, inclusive, on all of the following: (1) The number and major field of study of transfer pathways available to students. (2) The percentage of students who used the transfer pathway framework and who were granted admission to the University of California, broken down by campus. (3) The percentage of students who used the transfer pathway framework and who graduated from the University of California within two or three academic years, broken down by campus.