California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2190 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/05/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2190AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2016 INTRODUCED BY  Committee on Business and Professions   (   Assembly Members Bonilla (Chair), Jones (Vice Chair), Baker, Bloom, Campos, Chang, Dodd, Mullin, Wilk, and Wood   )   Assembly Member   Salas   (   Principal coauthor:  Senator   Hill   )  FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to amend Sections 4928 and 4934 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2190, as amended,  Committee on Business and Professions   Salas  . Acupuncture Board: executive officer. Existing law, the Acupuncture Licensure Act, provides for the licensure and regulation of the practice of acupuncture by the Acupuncture Board, within the Department of Consumer Affairs. Existing law authorizes the board, with the approval of the Director of Consumer Affairs, to employ personnel necessary to administer the Acupuncture Licensure Act, including an executive officer who is exempt from civil service. Existing law repeals the provisions establishing the board and authority for it to employ personnel on January 1, 2017. The bill would extend the operation of the board and the board's authority to appoint an executive officer exempt from civil service until January 1, 2019. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 4928 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 4928. (a) The Acupuncture Board, which consists of seven members, shall enforce and administer this chapter. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019, and as of that date is repealed. (c) Notwithstanding any other law, the repeal of this section renders the board subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature. SEC. 2. Section 4934 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 4934. (a) The board, by and with the approval of the director, may appoint an executive officer who is exempt from the State Civil Service Act (Part 2 (commencing with Section 18500) of Division 5 of Title 2 of the Government Code). (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019, and as of that date is repealed.