California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2193 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/05/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2193AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2016 INTRODUCED BY  Committee on Business and Professions   (   Assembly Members Bonilla (Chair), Jones (Vice Chair), Baker, Bloom, Campos, Chang, Dodd, Mullin, Ting, Wilk, and Wood   )   Assembly Member   Salas   (   Principal coauthor:   Senator   Hill   )  FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to amend  Section 2460   Sections 2460, 3504, and 3512  of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2193, as amended,  Committee on Business and Professions   Salas  . California Board of Podiatric  Medicine.   Medicine: Physician Assistant Board: extension.  Existing law provides for the certification and regulation of podiatrists by the California Board of Podiatric Medicine within the jurisdiction of the Medical Board of California. Under existing law,  pr   ovisions establishing  the California Board of Podiatric Medicine will be repealed on January 1, 2017. This bill would extend the operation of the California Board of Podiatric Medicine until January 1, 2021.  Existing law, the Physician Assistant Practice Act, provides for the licensure and regulation of physician assistants by the Physician Assistant Board, which is within the jurisdiction of the Medical Board of California, and authorizes the Physician Assistant Board, except as specified, to employ personnel necessary to carry out the provisions of that act, including an executive officer. Existing law repeals provisions establishing the Physician Assistant Board and the authorization for the board to employ personnel as of January 1, 2017.   This bill would extend the operation of the Physician Assistant Board and the board's authority to employ personnel until January 1, 2021.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2460 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 2460. (a) There is created within the jurisdiction of the Medical Board of California the California Board of Podiatric Medicine. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2021, and as of that date is repealed. Notwithstanding any other law, the repeal of this section renders the California Board of Podiatric Medicine subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature.  SEC. 2.   Section 3504 of the   Business and Professions Code   is amended to read:  3504. There is established a Physician Assistant Board within the jurisdiction of the Medical Board of California. The board consists of nine members. This section shall remain in effect only until January 1,  2017,   2021,  and as of that date is  repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2017, deletes or extends that date.   repealed.  Notwithstanding any  other provision of  law, the repeal of this section renders the board subject to review by the appropriate policy committees of the Legislature.  SEC. 3.   Section 3512 of the   Business and Professions Code   is amended to read:  3512. (a) Except as provided in Sections 159.5 and 2020, the board shall employ within the limits of the Physician Assistant Fund all personnel necessary to carry out  the provisions of  this chapter including an executive officer who shall be exempt from civil service. The Medical Board of California and board shall make all necessary expenditures to carry out  the provisions of  this chapter from the funds established by Section 3520. The board may accept contributions to effect the purposes of this chapter. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1,  2017,   2021,  and as of that date is  repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2017, deletes or extends that date.   repealed.