BILL NUMBER: AB 220ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JULY 6, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 23, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Holden FEBRUARY 3, 2015 An act to amend Section 51224.5 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 220, Holden. Pupil instruction: mathematics: algebra. Existing law requires the adopted course of study for grades 7 to 12, inclusive, to include courses in mathematics, including algebra. Existing law requires a pupil to complete 2 courses in mathematics in grades 9 to 12, inclusive, in order to receive a diploma of graduation from high school, and provides that at least one of these courses, or a combination of the 2 courses, shall meet or exceed the rigor of the content standards for Algebra I, as adopted by the State Board of Education. Existing law exempts a pupil in grades 9 to 12, inclusive, from the requirement that he or she complete a course that meets or exceeds the rigor of the content standards for Algebra I, as adopted by the state board, if that pupil, before enrolling in grade 9, completes coursework in algebra that meets or exceeds the rigor of the content standards for Algebra I, as adopted by the state board. This bill would instead require, before a pupil receives a diploma of graduation from high school, that a pupil complete at least one course, or a combination of the 2 courses required for graduation, that meets or exceeds the rigor of Algebra I or Mathematics I, that is aligned to the content standards adopted by the state board. The bill would provide that a pupil who completes coursework that meets or exceeds the content standards for Algebra I adopted by the state board shall be deemed to have satisfied the graduation requirement. The bill would also exempt from the Algebra I or Mathematics I graduation requirement those pupils who, before enrollment in grade 9, completed a course in Algebra I or Mathematics I, or mathematics courses of equal rigor, that are aligned to the content standards adopted by the state board. To the extent that the bill would impose new duties on school districts, it would constitute a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51224.5 of the Education Code is amended to read: 51224.5. (a) The adopted course of study for grades 7 to 12, inclusive, shall include algebra as part of the mathematics area of study pursuant to subdivision (f) of Section 51220. (b) Before receiving a diploma of graduation from high school, a pupil shall complete at least one course, or a combination of the two courses required for graduation pursuant to subparagraph (B) of paragraph (1) of subdivision (a) of Section 51225.3, that meets or exceeds the rigor of Algebra I or Mathematics I, that is aligned to the content standards adopted by the state board pursuant to Sections 60605.8 and 60605.11. (c) A pupil who, before enrollment in grade 9, completes a course in Algebra I or Mathematics I, or mathematics courses of equal rigor, that is aligned to the content standards adopted by the state board, is exempt from subdivision (b), but is not exempt from the requirement that the pupil complete two courses in mathematics while enrolled in grades 9 to 12, inclusive, as specified in subparagraph (B) of paragraph (1) of subdivision (a) of Section 51225.3. (d) A pupil who has completed a course or courses that meet or exceed the content standards for Algebra I adopted by the state board pursuant to Section 60605, as that section read on June 30, 2011, shall be deemed to have satisfied the graduation requirement specified in subdivision (b). SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.