California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2253 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/25/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2253AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Grove (Coauthors: Assembly Members Gallagher, Mathis, Melendez, and Olsen) FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to add Section 5163.5 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2253, as amended, Grove. Specialized license  plates: In God We Trust.   plates.  Existing law authorizes a state agency to apply to the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) to sponsor a specialized license plate program and requires the DMV to issue those license plates if the sponsoring state agency meets certain requirements. Existing law requires the DMV to charge specified fees related to the issuance of those plates and to deposit the fees, less the DMV's costs, in the Specialized License Plate Fund. Existing law requires that moneys in the fund be allocated, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to the sponsoring agency in proportion to the amount that is attributable to the agency's specialized license plate program. Existing law authorizes the sponsoring agency to use these moneys to fund projects and programs that promote the state agency's official policy, mission, or work. This bill would require the Department of Veterans  Affairs   Affairs, in consultation with the State Treasurer,  to apply to the DMV to sponsor  an In God We Trust   specified historic state and federal motto  license plate  program   programs  and would require the DMV to issue those specialized license plates for  that program   those programs  if the Department of Veterans Affairs satisfies certain requirements. Notwithstanding the above-described provisions regarding fees for specialized license  plates, the bill would require the additional fees for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of these specialized license plates to be deposited, after the DMV deducts its administrative costs, in a newly created fund, to be available upon appropriation by the Legislature for the purpose of funding specified veterans  programs.   programs and services.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5163.5 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 5163.5. (a) The Department of Veterans  Affairs   Affairs, in consultation with the State Treasurer,  shall apply to the Department of Motor Vehicles, pursuant to Section 5156, to sponsor  an In God We Trust license plate program. The Department of Motor Vehicles shall issue specialized license plates for that program if the Department of Veterans Affairs complies with the requirements of this article.   the   following historic state and federal motto license plate programs:   (1) E Pluribus Unum.  (2) Liberty.   (3) In God We Trust.   (4) We the People.   (5) Eureka! I have found it!   (b) The Department of Motor Vehicles shall issue specialized license plates for each program provided in subdivision (a) if the Department of Veterans Affairs complies with the requirements of this article.   (b)   (c)  Notwithstanding subdivision (c) of Section 5157, the additional fees prescribed by Section 5157 for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of the specialized license plates shall be deposited, after the Department of Motor Vehicles deducts its administrative costs, in the Veterans Housing and Homelessness Prevention Fund, which is hereby established in the State Treasury. The funds in the account shall be used, upon appropriation by the Legislature to the Department of Veterans Affairs, to support the Veterans Housing and Homelessness Prevention Program and the development of  affordable   supportive  services for  veterans.   veterans living in those units funded by the Veterans Housing and Homelessness Prevention Program.