California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2260 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/27/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2260AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wood FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to add Section 1797.228 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2260, as amended, Wood. Emergency medical services. Existing law, the Emergency Medical Services System and the Prehospital Emergency Medical Care Personnel Act, governs local emergency medical services (EMS) systems. The act establishes the Emergency Medical Services Authority, which is responsible for the coordination and integration of all state agencies concerning emergency medical services. Existing law requires a local EMS agency to plan, implement, and evaluate an emergency medical services system, as specified, and authorizes the local EMS agency to develop and submit a plan to the authority for an emergency medical services system according to prescribed guidelines that address data collection and evaluation, among other things. This bill would require the authority, before January 1, 2018, to determine a single set of data elements and formatting for air ambulance providers to submit to local EMS agencies, after consulting with air ambulance providers and local EMS agencies. The bill would authorize the authority to reconvene these stakeholders annually to modify the elements and formatting of the data. The bill would prohibit the authority from mandating that an air ambulance provider use a specific electronic health record system to collect and share data with a local EMS agency.  The bill would require an air ambulance provider to ensure that its electronic health record system can be integrated with the local EMS agency's data system, as specified.  The bill would prohibit a local EMS agency from requiring additional data reporting from an air ambulance provider once the single data set has been established. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1797.228 is added to the Health and Safety Code, immediately following Section 1797.227, to read: 1797.228. (a) (1) Before January 1, 2018, the authority shall determine a single set of data elements and formatting for air ambulance providers to submit to local EMS agencies. (2) (A) The authority shall convene interested stakeholders for the purpose of determining the single set of data elements and formatting. (B) Stakeholders shall include representatives of the local EMS agencies, air ambulance providers, and the authority. The authority may reconvene the stakeholders annually to modify the elements and formatting of the data. (3) The data elements and formatting shall comply with the National EMS Information System (NEMSIS) and California EMS Information System (CEMSIS) electronic health record. (b) The authority shall not mandate that an air ambulance provider use a specific electronic health record system to collect and share data with the local EMS agency. (c) In addition to submitting data to the local EMS agency, an air ambulance provider shall submit data directly to the authority if the authority requests it.  When submitting data to the local EMS agency, the air ambulance provider sh  all ensure that the electronic health record system can be integrated with the local EMS agency's NEMSIS and CEMSIS compliant data system, so that the   local EMS agency may collect data from the provider.  (d) After the single data set described in subdivision (a) has been established, a local EMS agency shall not require additional data elements or formatting from an air ambulance provider.