California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2290 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/27/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2290AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Santiago FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to add Section 60605.5 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2290, as amended, Santiago. Pupil instruction: world languages: revision of content standards. Existing law requires the State Board of Education, on or before June 1, 2009, to adopt content standards for teaching foreign languages in kindergarten and grades 1 to 12, inclusive, pursuant to recommendations developed by the Superintendent of Public Instruction. This bill would authorize the Superintendent to recommend revisions to the World Language Content Standards for California Public Schools, adopted pursuant to the above requirement, to the state board and would require the state board to adopt, reject, or modify the recommendations on or before  July 31, 2018.   January 31, 2019.  The bill would require the state board to explain, in writing, to the Governor and the Legislature the reasons for modifying the recommended revised content standards. The bill would require the Superintendent, in consultation with the state board, to select a group of experts for purposes of assisting the Superintendent in developing the recommendations. The bill would require the Superintendent to hold a minimum of 2 public hearings in order for the public to provide input on the Superintendent's recommendations and would require the state board to adopt, reject, or modify the recommendations at a subsequent public meeting. The bill would require that revisions to the World Language Content Standards for California Public Schools be incorporated into the curriculum framework and the evaluation criteria for world languages for purposes of adopting instructional materials. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 60605.5 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60605.5. (a) The Superintendent may recommend to the state board revisions to the World Language Content Standards for California Public Schools adopted by the state board in 2009 pursuant to Section 60605.3. On or before  July 31, 2018,  January 31, 2019,  the state board shall adopt, reject, or modify any revisions recommended by the Superintendent. If the state board modifies any revisions recommended to these content standards, it shall explain, in writing, to the Governor and the Legislature the reasons for modifying the recommended revised content standards. (b) In consultation with the state board, the Superintendent shall select a group of experts in this subject area for purposes of assisting the Superintendent in developing recommendations pursuant to this section. (c) (1) The Superintendent shall hold a minimum of two public hearings in order for the public to provide input on the revisions recommended pursuant  to  this section and the state board shall adopt, reject, or modify those recommendations at a subsequent public meeting. (2) The public hearings and meetings required by this subdivision shall be held pursuant to the Bagley-Keene Open Meeting Act (Article 9 (commencing with Section 11120) of Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code). (d) If the World Language Content Standards for California Public Schools is revised pursuant to subdivision (a), during the next revision of the corresponding curriculum framework and evaluation criteria, the Instructional Quality Commission shall ensure that the revisions are incorporated into that curriculum framework and evaluation criteria for purposes of adopting instructional materials.