California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2301 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/25/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2301AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chu FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to add and repeal Section 15656.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to residential care facilities for the elderly. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2301, as amended, Chu. Residential care facilities for the elderly: elder abuse. Existing law, the California Residential Care Facilities for the Elderly Act, provides for the licensure of residential care facilities for the elderly by the State Department of Social Services. Existing law establishes rights for residents of residential care facilities for the elderly, including the right to contact the department or the long-term care ombudsman, or both, regarding grievances. Existing law, the Elder Abuse and Dependent Adult Civil Protection Act, establishes various procedures for the reporting, investigation, and prosecution of elder and dependent adult abuse. This bill would require the California Health and Human Services Agency, on or before January 1, 2020, to file a report to the Legislature regarding  the manner in which   how  each county in the state invests in and  conducts services that train and equip   trains and equips  law enforcement officers to identify and investigate instances of elder abuse in long-term care and assisted living facilities within their jurisdiction, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 15656.5 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 15656.5. (a) On or before January 1, 2020, the California Health and Human Services Agency shall file a report to the Legislature regarding  the manner in which   how  each county in the state invests in and  conducts services that train and equip   trains and equips  law enforcement officers to identify and investigate instances of elder abuse in long-term care and assisted living facilities within their jurisdictions. (b) The report filed pursuant to subdivision (a) shall include, but not be limited to, the following information for each county: (1) The size and scope of the county's long-term care ombudsman program. (2) Whether or not the county sheriff's department maintains an elder abuse task force or a resource officer trained and equipped to investigate elder abuse cases or coordinates with the county long-term care ombudsman on elder abuse investigations and the way in which these programs are funded. (3) How  proactive the county's   frequently and which county  programs are  at engaging   able to engage  with long-term care  facilities and conducting services,   facilities,  including, but not limited to,  routine check-ins with facility managers and residents.   periodic visits to facilities.  (4) Whether or not the county's elder abuse task force or designated resource officer, if any,  has   makes  contact information available to long-term care facilities and their residents. (c) (1) A report to be submitted pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code. (2) Pursuant to Section  9795   10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2024.