California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2384 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/06/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2384AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 6, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 15, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gallagher  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Maienschein   and Mathis   )   (   Coauthor:   Senator   Fuller   )  FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to add Section 8587.6 to the Government Code, relating to terrorist activity. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2384, as amended, Gallagher. Terrorist activity. Under existing law, terrorist activity is generally punishable under laws proscribing criminal conduct, including laws proscribing train wrecking, false reporting of bombs, improper possession or transport of explosives and hazardous materials, and possession or use of weapons of mass destruction, assault, and others. Existing law also creates the Office of Emergency Services in the office of the Governor, with specified powers and duties relative to coordinating emergency  services.   services, including the coordination of the State Emergency Plan, as defined, and those programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in the state.  This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services,  if it creates a strategic plan or updates an existing strategic plan,   in the first update of the State Emergency Plan after January 1, 2017,  to develop a plan to enhance the public' s knowledge about how to identify and report terrorist  activity in the strategic plan or strategic plan update.   activity.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8587.6 is added to the Government Code, to read: 8587.6.  If the office creates a strategic plan, or updates an existing strategic plan,   In the first update of the State Emergency Plan after January 1, 2017,  the office shall, in the  strategic plan or strategic plan update,   State Emergency Plan,  develop a plan to enhance the public's knowledge about how to identify and report terrorist activity.