BILL NUMBER: AB 2384CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 268 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 15, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 6, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 6, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 15, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gallagher (Coauthors: Assembly Members Maienschein, Mathis, and Steinorth) (Coauthor: Senator Fuller) FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to add Section 8587.6 to the Government Code, relating to terrorist activity. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2384, Gallagher. Terrorist activity. Under existing law, terrorist activity is generally punishable under laws proscribing criminal conduct, including laws proscribing train wrecking, false reporting of bombs, improper possession or transport of explosives and hazardous materials, and possession or use of weapons of mass destruction, assault, and others. Existing law also creates the Office of Emergency Services in the office of the Governor, with specified powers and duties relative to coordinating emergency services, including the coordination of the State Emergency Plan, as defined, and those programs necessary for the mitigation of the effects of an emergency in the state. This bill would require the Office of Emergency Services, prior to January 1, 2018, to adopt a public education program to enhance the public's knowledge about how to identify and report suspected terrorist activity. The bill would require the office to post information about the program on its Internet Web site and to incorporate the program into relevant programs and trainings. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8587.6 is added to the Government Code, to read: 8587.6. (a) Prior to January 1, 2018, the office shall adopt a public education program to enhance the public's knowledge about how to identify and report suspected terrorist activity. (b) (1) The office shall post information about the program on its Internet Web site. (2) The office shall incorporate the program into relevant existing programs and trainings.