California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2455 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/03/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2455AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 3, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 6, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Chiu and Bonta  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Gonzalez  )  FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 2197.5 to the Elections Code, relating to voter registration. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2455, as amended, Chiu. Electronic voter registration: public postsecondary educational institutions. Under existing law, a person may not be registered to vote except by affidavit of registration. Pursuant to the Student Voter Registration Act of 2003, the Secretary of State is required to annually provide every high school, community college, California State University, and University of California campus with voter registration forms. The act also requires every community college and California State University campus that operates an automated class registration system, in coordination with the Secretary of State, to permit students during the class registration process to apply to register to vote online by submitting an affidavit of voter registration electronically on the Internet Web site of the Secretary of State. The act encourages the University of California to comply with this provision. This bill would require the California State University and the California Community Colleges to implement a process and the infrastructure to allow a person who enrolls online at the institution, to submit an affidavit of voter registration electronically on the Internet Web site of the Secretary of State by July 1, 2018. The bill would encourage the University of California to comply with its provisions. By requiring community colleges to provide a higher level of service, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature, in enacting this act, to take preliminary measures towards the establishment of an automatic voter registration system for California citizens enrolled at state public college and university campuses. SEC. 2. Section 2197.5 is added to the Elections Code, to read: 2197.5. No later than July 1, 2018, the California State University and the California Community Colleges shall implement a process and the infrastructure to allow a person who enrolls online at the  institution,   institution  to submit an affidavit of voter registration electronically on the Internet Web site of the Secretary of State in accordance with this chapter. The University of California is encouraged to coordinate with the Secretary of State pursuant to this section. SEC. 3. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.