California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2483 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/26/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2483CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 200 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 26, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 26, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 5, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Agriculture (Assembly Members Dodd (Chair), Gallagher (Vice Chair), Gray, Grove, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Mathis, Quirk, and Salas) FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to amend Section 20470 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to livestock. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2483, Committee on Agriculture. Livestock Identification Advisory Board. Existing law creates the Livestock Identification Advisory Board, and prescribes the membership, functions, and duties of the board. Existing law requires the board to meet at the call of its chairperson at least once in every 3 months. This bill would instead require the board to meet at least twice in every calendar year. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 20470 of the Food and Agricultural Code is amended to read: 20470. The board shall meet at the call of its chairperson. It shall meet at least twice in every calendar year.