California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2532 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/28/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2532CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 759 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 28, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 28, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 15, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 19, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chiu (Coauthor: Assembly Member Williams) FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to repeal Sections 9601.5 and 9601.7 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2532, Chiu. Employment services: verification. Existing law requires each state or local government agency or community action agency, or any private organization contracting with a state or local government agency, that provides specified employment services to verify an individual's legal status or authorization to work prior to providing services to that individual in accordance with procedures established under federal law. Existing law specifies that proof of legal status or authorization to work includes specified documents providing evidence of legal residence or authorization to work in the United States. It also specifies that those provisions requiring verification of an individual's legal status or authorization to work prior to providing employment services do not apply to employment services offered by school districts under secondary school and adult education programs. Existing law requires each state or local government agency or community action agency, or any private organization contracting with a state or local government agency, that provides specified employment services to post in a prominent location in the workplace a notice stating that only citizens or those persons legally authorized to work in the United States will be permitted to use the agency's or organization's employment services that are funded by the federal or state government, as specified. This bill would repeal the above-described requirements. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 9601.5 of the Unemployment Insurance Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 9601.7 of the Unemployment Insurance Code is repealed.