California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2579 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/11/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2579AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 11, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Low FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act relating to recycling. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2579, as amended, Low. Food service packaging products: extended producer responsibility program: study. The California Integrated Waste Management Act of 1989, administered by the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, regulates the disposal, management, and recycling of solid waste. This bill would require the department, on or before January 1, 2018, to  conduct   complete  a study to establish baseline data relating to food service  packaging.  packaging that contains specified information, including the current and potential markets for recycled and composted food service packaging  products.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) For purposes of this section, "food service packaging" means single-use packaging products used by food service providers for their  customers.   customers for food that is prepared onsite.  (b) On or before January 1, 2018, the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery shall  conduct   complete  a study to establish baseline data relating to food service packaging.  (c) The study required pursuant to subdivision (b) shall contain all of the following information:   (1) The amount of food service packaging, by material type, used in California and the disposition of the products, including the percentages recycled, composted, and disposed, and an estimate of the percentage littered.   (2) The facilities located in the state that accept food service packaging for recycling or composting, the cities they serve, and the infrastructure needed to increase the recycling rate to reach California's statewide recycling goal of 75 percent and reduce litter.   (3) The current and potential markets for recycled and composted food service packaging products.   (4) Barriers to increased recycling and composting of food service packaging and steps that may be taken to remove those barriers.