California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2617 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/28/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2617AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Mayes FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Chapter 7.8 (commencing with Section 25685) to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, relating to water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2617, as amended, Mayes. Water efficiency measures. The California Constitution requires that the water resources of the state be put to beneficial use to the fullest extent of which they are capable and that the waste or unreasonable use or unreasonable method of use of water be prevented. Existing law requires the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission (Energy Commission), on a biennial basis, to conduct assessments and forecasts of all aspects of energy industry supply, production, transportation, delivery, and distribution. Existing law requires the Energy Commission, beginning November 1, 2003, and biennially thereafter, to adopt an integrated energy policy report containing an overview of major energy trends and issues facing the state. This bill would require the Energy Commission to develop and solicit comments on a proposed report, in consultation with certain subject matter  experts,   experts and in cooperation with the State Water Resources Control Board and the Department of Water Resources,  by December 1, 2017, and, by July 1, 2018, to issue a final report that contains, among other things, the projected benefits of recommended voluntary water efficiency measures and an analysis of any unintended adverse environmental impacts that would result from various water efficiency measures. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 7.8 (commencing with Section 25685) is added to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, to read: CHAPTER 7.8. COST-EFFECTIVE WATER EFFICIENCY MEASURES 25685. It is the intent of the Legislature that the state identify and recommend the most cost-effective water efficiency measures that achieve the greatest reduction in water use and avoid any unintended adverse environmental impacts. 25686. As used in this chapter:  (a) "Evapotranspiration" means a loss of water from the soil, including losses resulting from evaporation and losses resulting from transpiration from the plants growing on the soil.   (a)   (   b)  "Highly efficient consumer appliances and landscape systems"  includes, but is   include, but are  not limited to, irrigation systems, toilets, showers,  pool covers,  and clothes washers.  (b)   (   c)  "Public entity" has the same meaning as defined in Section 375 of the Water Code.  (c)   (   d)  "Turfgrass" means any living grass that is used in fields or yards at a residential or commercial property, private park, athletic field, or public school.  (d)   (   e)  "Unintended adverse environmental impacts" include, but are not limited to, impacts on climate change, net effect on carbon sequestration, increased erosion, and impacts to stormwater runoff. 25687. By December 1, 2017, the commission, in consultation with persons that include, but are not limited to, subject matter experts at the University of California, the California State University, and local water districts,  and in cooperation with the State Water Resources Control Board and the Department of Water Resources,  shall develop and solicit comments on a proposed report that contains all of the following: (a) An analysis of the relative costs and benefits of incentives for various water efficiency measures,  including, but not limited to, turfgrass removal and replacement with either drought-resistant turfgrass or artificial turf, investments in graywater infrastructure to supply water to outdoor landscapes, and rebates for highly efficient consumer appliances and landscape systems.   including the consideration of the impact of evapotranspiration rates in different hydrological regions of the state. The water efficiency measures considered shall include, but not be limited to, the following:   (1) Turfgrass removal and replacement with either drought-resistant turfgrass or artificial turf.   (2) The use of conservation-based irrigation technology such as smart controllers.   (3) Investments in graywater infrastructure to supply water to outdoor landscapes.   (4) Rebates for highly efficient consumer appliances and landscape systems.  (b) An analysis of any unintended adverse environmental impacts that would result from the water efficiency measures considered pursuant to subdivision (a). (c) The projected benefits of recommended voluntary water efficiency measures. 25688. By July 1, 2018, the commission shall issue a final report that contains all of the following: (a) An identification of the most cost-effective incentives for water efficiency measures in terms of water use reduction per dollar spent. (b) Recommendations to public entities to help them prioritize the most cost-effective solutions for granting incentives or rebates for water efficiency measures. (c) An analysis of any unintended adverse environmental impacts that would result from the water efficiency measures considered pursuant to subdivision (a). (d) The projected benefits of recommended voluntary water efficiency measures.