BILL NUMBER: AB 2620AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 29, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 11, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Dababneh ( Coauthors: Senators Galgiani and Vidak ) FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 99684.5 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2620, as amended, Dababneh. Passenger rail projects: funding. Proposition 116, an initiative measure, enacted the Clean Air and Transportation Improvement Act of 1990, which establishes the Clean Air and Transportation Improvement Fund, continuously appropriates specified amounts from the fund for, among other things, rights-of-way for rail purposes and capital expenditures deemed necessary for a specified rail service, and requires the California Transportation Commission to adopt guidelines for the approval of grants for transit projects which are essential to the implementation of safe and reliable transit services. The act authorizes, if any of the funds are not expended or encumbered prior to July 1, 2010, the Legislature to reallocate the funds for any other passenger rail project in the state by a statute passed in each house by a 2/3 vote. This bill would reallocate funds allocated pursuant to the act that are not expended or encumbered by July 1, 2020, to any other existing passenger rail project with existing railservice.service, except as specified. The bill would require the commission to determine the projects pursuant to this reallocation. By reallocating unexpended or unencumbered funds to any other existing passenger rail project, the bill would make an appropriation. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 99684.5 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 99684.5. (a) Funds allocated pursuant to this part that are not expended or encumbered by July 1, 2020, are hereby reallocated pursuant to subdivision (b) of Section 99684 to any other existing passenger rail project with existing rail service. (b) The California Transportation Commission shall determine the projects pursuant to the reallocation as described in subdivision (a). The high-speed rail project as described in Chapter 20 (commencing with Section 2704) of Division 3 of the Streets and Highways Code is not eligible to receive reallocated funds pursuant to subdivision (a) as it is not providing existing rail service.