BILL NUMBER: AB 2623ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 18, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 15, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 28, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Gordon and Irwin FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to amend Section 11546.2 of the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2623, Gordon. State information security costs: annual report. Existing law requires each state agency and certain designated state entities to annually report to the Department of Technology a summary of its actual and projected information technology and telecommunications costs, as specified. This bill would additionally require these state agencies and entities to annually report to the department, beginning on or before January 1, 2018, a summary of its actual and projected information security costs, as specified. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 11546.2 of the Government Code is amended to read: 11546.2. (a) On or before February 1 of every year, each state agency and state entity subject to Section 11546.1, shall submit, as instructed by the Department of Technology, a summary of its actual and projected information technology and telecommunications costs, including, but not limited to, personnel, for the immediately preceding fiscal year and current fiscal year, showing current expenses and projected expenses for the current fiscal year, in a format prescribed by the Department of Technology in order to capture statewide information technology expenditures. (b) On or before January 1, 2018, and annually thereafter, each state agency and state entity subject to Section 11546.1 shall submit, as instructed and in a format prescribed by the Department of Technology, a summary of its actual and projected information security costs, including, but not limited to, personnel, for the immediately preceding fiscal year and current fiscal year, showing current expenses and projected expenses for the current fiscal year, in order to capture statewide information security expenditures, including the expenditure of federal grant funds for information security purposes.