California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB266 Amended / Bill

Filed 09/04/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 266AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 13, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 30, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 2, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 11, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 5, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Bonta, Cooley, Jones-Sawyer, and Lackey (Coauthor: Assembly Member Chiu) FEBRUARY 10, 2015 An act  relating to medical cannabis.   to amend Section 2220.05 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to medical marijuana   .  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 266, as amended, Bonta. Medical  Board of California:  cannabis. Existing law, the Compassionate Use Act of 1996, an initiative measure enacted by the approval of Proposition 215 at the November 6, 1996, statewide general election, authorizes the use of marijuana for medical purposes.  Existing law enacted by the Legislature requires the establishment of a program for the issuance of identification cards to qualified patients so that they may lawfully use marijuana for medical purposes, and requires the establishment of guidelines for the lawful cultivation of marijuana grown for medical use. Existing law provides for the licensure of various professions by the Department of Consumer Affairs. Existing law, the Sherman Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Law, provides for the regulation of food, drugs, devices, and cosmetics, as specified. A violation of that law is a crime.   Existing law requires the Medical Board of California to prioritize its investigative and prosecutorial resources to ensure that the most harmful physicians and surgeons are identified and disciplined expeditiously, and provides a list of allegations that shall be prioritized.   This bill would add repeatedly recommending excessive cannabis to patients for medical purposes, and repeatedly recommending cannabis to patients without a good faith examination and a medical reason, to the list of prioritized allegations.  This bill  , contingent on the enactment of SB 643, would state the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that would enact a comprehensive regulatory framework for medical marijuana in the state.   would become operative only if SB 643 of the 2015-16 Regular Session is enacted and becomes operative.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 2220.05 of the   Business and Professions Code   is amended to read:  2220.05. (a) In order to ensure that its resources are maximized for the protection of the public, the Medical Board of California shall prioritize its investigative and prosecutorial resources to ensure that physicians and surgeons representing the greatest threat of harm are identified and disciplined expeditiously. Cases involving any of the following allegations shall be handled on a priority basis, as follows, with the highest priority being given to cases in the first paragraph: (1) Gross negligence, incompetence, or repeated negligent acts that involve death or serious bodily injury to one or more patients, such that the physician and surgeon represents a danger to the public. (2) Drug or alcohol abuse by a physician and surgeon involving death or serious bodily injury to a patient. (3) Repeated acts of clearly excessive prescribing, furnishing, or administering of controlled substances, or repeated acts of prescribing, dispensing, or furnishing of controlled substances without a good faith prior examination of the patient and medical reason therefor. However, in no event shall a physician and surgeon prescribing, furnishing, or administering controlled substances for intractable pain consistent with lawful prescribing, including, but not limited to, Sections 725, 2241.5, and 2241.6 of this code and Sections 11159.2 and 124961 of the Health and Safety Code, be prosecuted for excessive prescribing and prompt review of the applicability of these provisions shall be made in any complaint that may implicate these provisions.  (4) Repeated acts of clearly excessive recommending of cannabis to patients for medical purposes, or repeated acts of recommending cannabis to patients for medical purposes without a good faith prior examination of the patient and a medical reason for the recommendation.   (4)   (5)  Sexual misconduct with one or more patients during a course of treatment or an examination.  (5)   (6)  Practicing medicine while under the influence of drugs or alcohol. (b) The board may by regulation prioritize cases involving an allegation of conduct that is not described in subdivision (a). Those cases prioritized by regulation shall not be assigned a priority equal to or higher than the priorities established in subdivision (a). (c) The Medical Board of California shall indicate in its annual report mandated by Section 2312 the number of temporary restraining orders, interim suspension orders, and disciplinary actions that are taken in each priority category specified in subdivisions (a) and (b).  SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to enact legislation that would enact a comprehensive regulatory framework for medical marijuana in the state.  SEC. 2. This measure shall become operative only if Senate Bill 643 of the 2015-16 Regular Session is enacted and becomes operative.