California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2691 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/15/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2691AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 15, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 19, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Holden FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 2607.5 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2691, as amended, Holden. Property taxation: Monthly Property Tax Payment Program. Existing property tax law specifies that all taxes on personal property and half of the taxes on real property are due and payable each November 1 and provides that these taxes are delinquent if not paid by each December 10. Existing property tax law specifies that the second half of taxes on real property is due each February 1 and provides that these taxes are delinquent if not paid by each April 10. This bill would authorize a county board of supervisors to implement a Monthly Property Tax Payment Program to authorize qualified taxpayers, as defined, to pay the  ad valorem  property tax owed on the qualified taxpayer's principal place of residence in monthly installments.  The   bill would authorize the ordinance or resolution implementing the program to set forth specific procedures for purposes of determining delinquency and default, as specified. The bill would require the monthly property tax payment to be allocated among the county, cities, and special districts in proportion to the amounts of ad valorem property tax revenue otherwise allocated among these local agencies.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2607.5 is added to the Revenue and Taxation Code, to read: 2607.5. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a county board of supervisors may adopt a resolution or ordinance to implement a Monthly Property Tax Payment Program, to authorize qualified taxpayers to pay the  ad valorem  property tax owed on the qualified taxpayer's principal place of residence in monthly installments.  (b) The ordinance or resolution implementing the program may set forth specific procedures for the tax collector to deem as timely monthly installments paid late but within a specified grace period due to reasonable cause for purposes of determining delinquency and default.   (c) The monthly property tax payment shall be allocated among the county, cities, and special districts in proportion to the amounts of ad valorem property tax revenue otherwise allocated among these local agencies.   (b)   (d)  For purposes of this section, "qualified taxpayers" means a taxpayer who is any or both of the following: (1) A person who is 62 years of age or older. (2) A person receiving supplemental security income for a disability, regardless of age.