BILL NUMBER: AB 2741ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 24, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 31, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 8, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Salas FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to amend Sections 65071 and 65073 of the Government Code, relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2741, Salas. Long-range transportation planning: California Transportation Plan. Existing law requires the Department of Transportation to complete the first update of the California Transportation Plan by December 31, 2015, and to update the plan every 5 years thereafter. Existing law requires the California Transportation Commission to review the plan and make certain recommendations. Existing law requires the Governor to adopt the plan and to submit it to the Legislature and the United States Secretary of Transportation. This bill, beginning in 2020, would require updates to the plan to be approved by the commission prior to submission to the Legislature and the Governor. The bill would require the department to submit a draft of its proposed update to the commission for its comments by June 30, 2020, and every 5 years thereafter. The bill, if the commission does not approve an updated plan, would require the department to revise its proposed update in consultation with the commission. The bill would make other conforming changes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 65071 of the Government Code is amended to read: 65071. (a) The department shall update the California Transportation Plan every five years consistent with this chapter. The first update shall be completed by December 31, 2015. (b) Beginning with the 2020 update, the department shall submit the updated plan to the California Transportation Commission for its approval. The department shall submit a draft of the updated plan to the commission for its comments by June 30, 2020, and every five years thereafter. (c) If the commission does not approve an updated plan, the department shall revise its proposed update in consultation with the commission. SEC. 2. Section 65073 of the Government Code is amended to read: 65073. The department shall also consult with, coordinate its activities with, and make a draft of its proposed updated plan available to the Strategic Growth Council, the State Air Resources Board, the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, the air quality management districts, public transit operators, and the regional transportation planning agencies for review and comment. The department shall also provide an opportunity for input by the general public. Prior to approving the updated plan pursuant to Section 65071, the commission shall make a final draft available to the Legislature and Governor for review and comment. Upon approval of the updated plan by the commission, the Governor shall adopt the updated plan and submit it to the Legislature and the United States Secretary of Transportation.