BILL NUMBER: AB 2762AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 15, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Baker FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to amend Section 185020 of the Public Utilities Code, 30814 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to high-speed rail. transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2762, as amended, Baker. High-Speed Rail Authority. Toll bridges: pedestrians and bicycles. Existing law, until January 1, 2021, prohibits a toll from being imposed on the passage of a pedestrian or bicycle over any bridge that is part of the state highway system, as specified. This bill would extend that prohibition until January 1, 2022. Existing law creates the High-Speed Rail Authority with specified powers and duties relative to development and implementation of a high-speed rail system. The authority is comprised of 9 members appointed by the Governor and the Legislature. This bill would make a nonsubstantive change to these provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no yes . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 30814 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read: 30814. (a) No toll shall be imposed on the passage of a pedestrian or bicycle over any bridge that is part of the state highway system, on which the travel of pedestrians and bicycles is otherwise authorized, and on which tolls are imposed on the passage of motor vehicles, including any bridge constructed pursuant to a franchise granted under this article. (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2021, 2022, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2021, 2022, deletes or extends that date. SECTION 1. Section 185020 of the Public Utilities Code is amended to read: 185020. (a) There is in the Transportation Agency a High-Speed Rail Authority. (b) (1) The authority is composed of nine members as follows: (A) Five members appointed by the Governor. (B) Two members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. (C) Two members appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly. (2) For the purposes of making appointments to the authority, the Governor, the Senate Committee on Rules, and the Speaker of the Assembly shall take into consideration geographical diversity to ensure that all regions of the state are adequately represented. (c) Except as provided in subdivision (d), and until their successors are appointed, members of the authority shall hold office for terms of four years. A vacancy shall be filled by the appointing power making the original appointment, by appointing a member to serve the remainder of the term. (d) (1) On and after January 1, 2001, the terms of all persons who are then members of the authority shall expire, but those members may continue to serve until they are reappointed or until their successors are appointed. In order to provide for evenly staggered terms, persons appointed or reappointed to the authority after January 1, 2001, shall be appointed to initial terms to expire as follows: (A) Of the five persons appointed by the Governor, one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2002, one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2003, one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2004, and two shall be appointed to terms which expires on December 31, 2005. (B) Of the two persons appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules, one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2002, and one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2004. (C) Of the two persons appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly, one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2003, and one shall be appointed to a term which expires on December 31, 2005. (2) Following expiration of each of the initial terms provided for in this subdivision, the term shall expire every four years thereafter on December 31. (e) Members of the authority are subject to the Political Reform Act of 1974 (Title 9 (commencing with Section 81000) of the Government Code). (f) From among its members, the authority shall elect a chairperson, who shall preside at all meetings of the authority, and a vice chairperson to preside in the absence of the chairperson. The chairperson shall serve a term of one year. (g) Five members of the authority constitute a quorum for taking any action by the authority.