BILL NUMBER: AB 2780CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 188 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 25, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 25, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 15, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 9, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Holden FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to amend Section 12903 of the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2780, Holden. Fair Employment and Housing Council: membership: length of terms. Existing law creates the Fair Employment and Housing Council within the Department of Fair Employment and Housing. The council consists of 7 members, appointed by the Governor and confirmed by the Senate, who serve 4-year terms. This bill would, beginning with appointments to the council made on or after January 1, 2017, make the terms of 4 of the members 4 years in length and the terms of 3 of the members 2 years in length. The bill would provide that after the terms of these initial appointments expire, members would be appointed to serve 4-year terms. The bill would also provide that vacancies occurring prior to the expiration of the term would be filled by appointment for the unexpired term. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12903 of the Government Code is amended to read: 12903. There is in the Department of Fair Employment and Housing the Fair Employment and Housing Council. The council shall consist of seven members, to be known as council members, who shall be appointed by the Governor, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, and one of whom shall be designated as chairperson by the Governor. The Director of the Department of Fair Employment and Housing shall serve as a nonvoting ex-officio member of the council. (a) Appointments made to the council on and after January 1, 2017, shall be for the following terms: (1) Four of the members appointed shall serve terms of four years. (2) Three of the members appointed shall serve terms of two years. (b) Each member appointed after the expiration of the initial terms set forth in paragraphs (1) and (2) of subdivision (a) shall serve a term of four years. (c) Vacancies occurring prior to the expiration of the term shall be filled by appointment for the unexpired term.