California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2808 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/13/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2808AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gipson FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to  repeal   amend  Section 19604.7 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2808, as amended, Gipson. Horse racing: exchange wagering:  repeal deletion.   operative extension.  The Horse Racing Law authorizes exchange wagering, as provided, and authorizes the California Horse Racing Board to recover any costs associated with the licensing or regulation of exchange wagering by imposing an assessment on the exchange wagering licensee in an amount that does not exceed the reasonable costs associated with the licensing or regulation of exchange wagering. Existing law requires any racing association or racing fair receiving distributions from any exchange provider's exchange revenues to distribute a portion of that revenue to the official registering agency in a specified manner. Existing law makes these exchange wagering provisions inoperative on May 1, 2016, and repeals them on January 1, 2017. Violations of the Horse Racing Law are generally misdemeanors. This bill would  delete   e   xtend  those inoperative and repeal  dates.   dates to May 1, 2020, and January 1, 2021, respectively.  The bill, by  permanently  extending these requirements, the violation of which is a crime, would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 19604.7 of the Business and Professions Code is repealed.   SECTION 1.   Section 19604.7 of the   Business and Professions Code   is amended to read:  19604.7. This article shall become inoperative on May 1,  2016,   2020,  and, as of January 1,  2017,   2021,  is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1,  2017,   2021,  deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed. SEC. 2. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.