California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2862 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/01/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2862AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 1, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 12, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member O'Donnell (Principal coauthor: Senator Hancock) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Chu and Medina) (Coauthor: Senator Allen) FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 60605.13 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2862, as amended, O'Donnell. Pupil instruction: visual and performing arts: revision of content standards. Existing law requires the State Board of Education, on or before June 1, 2001, to adopt content standards in the curriculum area of visual and performing arts pursuant to recommendations developed by the Superintendent of Public Instruction. This bill would  authorize   require  the  Superintendent   Superintendent, in consultation with the Instructional Quality Commission,  to recommend revisions to the visual and performing arts content standards  in certain subjects  to the state  board   board,  and would require the state board to adopt, reject, or modify the recommendations on or before January  1,   31,  2019. The bill would require the  state board to explain, in writing, to the Governor and the Legislature the reasons for modifying the recommendations of the Superintendent, as assisted by   Superintendent, in consultation with the Instructional Quality Commission and the state board, to select  a group of experts in visual and performing  arts.   arts for purposes of assisting the Superintendent in developing recommendations under the bill.  The bill would require that the National Core Arts Standards developed by the National Coalition for Core Arts Standards serve as the basis for deliberations regarding revisions to the visual and performing arts content standards. The bill would require the  Superintendent   Superintendent, in consultation with the Instructional Quality Commission,  to hold a minimum of 2 public hearings in order for the public to provide input on the Superintendent's  recommendations   recommendations,  and would require the state board to adopt, reject, or modify the recommendations at a subsequent public  meeting.   meeting, in accordance with specified procedures.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 60605.13 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60605.13. (a) The  Superintendent may   Superintendent, in consultation with the Instructional Quality Commission, shall  recommend to the state board revisions to the visual and performing arts content standards  in the subjects of dance, theater, music, and visual arts  adopted by the state board pursuant to Section 60605.1.  On or before January 1, 2019, the state board shall adopt, reject, or modify any revisions recommended by the Superintendent. If the state board modifies the revisions recommended by the Superintendent, the state board shall explain, in writing, to the Governor and the Legislature the reasons for modifying the recommended revised content standards.  (b) In consultation with the  Instructional Quality Commission and the  state board, the Superintendent shall select a group of experts in visual and performing arts for purposes of assisting the Superintendent in developing recommendations pursuant to this section. A majority of this group of experts shall be current public school elementary or secondary classroom teachers who have a professional teaching credential that is valid under state law. (c) The National Core Arts Standards  in the subjects of dance, theater, music, and visual arts  developed by the National Coalition for Core Arts Standards shall serve as the basis for deliberations regarding revisions to the visual and performing arts content standards. (d) (1) The  Superintendent   Superintendent, in consultation with the Instructional Quality Commission,  shall hold a minimum of two public hearings in order for the public to provide input on the revisions recommended pursuant to this section and the state board shall adopt, reject, or modify those recommendations at a subsequent public meeting. (2) The public hearings and meetings required by this subdivision shall be held pursuant to the Bagley-Keene Open Meeting Act (Article 9 (commencing with Section 11120) of Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code).  (e) On or before November 30, 2018, the Superintendent shall present to the state board the revised visual and performing arts content standards, based on the work of the group of experts convened pursuant to subdivision (b), conducted in consultation with the Instructional Quality Commission.   (f) (1) On or before January 31, 2019, the state board shall adopt, reject, or modify any revisions to the visual and performing arts standards recommended by the Superintendent. If the state board modifies the revisions recommended by the Superintendent, the state board shall explain, in writing, the reasons for modifying the recommended revised content standards to the Governor and the Legislature.   (2) If the state board modifies the visual and performing arts content standards recommended by the Superintendent pursuant to subdivision (e), the state board shall, in a meeting conducted pursuant to the Bagley-Keene Open Meeting Act (Article 9 (commencing with Section 11120) of Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code), provide written reasons for its revisions. The state board shall not adopt revised visual and performing arts content standards at the same meeting it provides its written reasons, but, instead, shall adopt these revisions at a subsequent meeting conducted no later than March 31, 2019.   (3) If the state board rejects the visual and performing arts content standards recommended by the Superintendent pursuant to subdivision (e), the state board shall transmit to the Superintendent, the Governor, and the appropriate policy and fiscal committees of the Legislature a specific written explanation of the reasons for the rejection of the standards presented by the Superintendent.