California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2864 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/27/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2864AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 27, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chau FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to amend Section 51226.3 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2864, as amended, Chau. Pupil instruction: Chinese Exclusion Act of 1882: Geary Act of 1892.   Chinese Americans' contributions to   establishment of   transcontinental railroad.  Existing law requires the State Department of Education to incorporate materials relating to civil rights, human rights violations, genocide, slavery, and the Holocaust into publications that provide examples of curriculum resources for teacher use, consistent with the subject frameworks on history and social science and other requirements. Under existing law, the Legislature encourages the incorporation of survivor, rescuer, liberator, and witness oral testimony into the teaching of human rights, genocide, and the Holocaust. Existing law establishes the Instructional Quality Commission and requires the commission to, among other things, recommend curriculum frameworks to the State Board of Education. This bill would encourage all state and local professional development activities to provide teachers with content background and resources to assist them in teaching about the Chinese Exclusion Act of  1882, the Geary Act of 1892, and other specified laws relating to the discrimination against, and mistreatment of, Chinese and other minority groups.   1882 and the contributions of Chinese Americans to the establishment of the transcontinental railroad.  The bill would require those  laws   topics  be considered  in the next cycle in which   for inclusion, as prov   ided,   when the s   tate board revises and adopts  the history-social science curriculum framework  and its accompanying instructional materials are adopted.   on or after January 1, 2017.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 51226.3 of the Education Code is amended to read: 51226.3. (a) (1) The department shall incorporate into publications that provide examples of curriculum resources for teacher use those materials developed by publishers of nonfiction, trade books, and primary sources, or other public or private organizations, that are age appropriate and consistent with the subject frameworks on history and social science that deal with civil rights, human rights violations, genocide, slavery, and the Holocaust. (2) The Legislature encourages the department to incorporate into publications that provide examples of curriculum resources for teacher use those materials developed by publishers of nonfiction, trade books, and primary sources, or other public or private organizations, that are age appropriate and consistent with the subject frameworks on history and social science that deal with the Armenian, Cambodian, Darfur, and Rwandan genocides. (b) (1) The Legislature encourages the incorporation of survivor, rescuer, liberator, and witness oral testimony into the teaching of human rights, the Holocaust, and genocide, including, but not limited to, the Armenian, Cambodian, Darfur, and Rwandan genocides. (2) As used in this subdivision, "oral testimony" means the firsthand accounts of significant historical events presented in a format that includes, but is not limited to, in-person testimony, video, or a multimedia option, such as a DVD or an online video. (c) The Legislature encourages all state and local professional development activities to provide teachers with content background and resources to assist them in teaching about civil rights, human rights violations, genocide, slavery, the Armenian Genocide, and the Holocaust. (d) The Legislature encourages all state and local professional development activities to provide teachers with content background and resources to assist them in teaching about the Great Irish Famine of 1845-50. (e) The Great Irish Famine of 1845-50 shall be considered in the next cycle in which the history-social science curriculum framework and its accompanying instructional materials are adopted. (f) (1) The Legislature encourages all state and local professional development activities to provide teachers with content background and resources to assist them in teaching about the Chinese Exclusion Act of 1882  as the first major law to single out and forbid a specific ethnic group, the Chinese, from immigrating to, and becoming naturalized citizens of, the United States, and the Geary Act of 1892, which extended the prohibitions of the Chinese Exclusion Act of 1882 and imposed new and onerous requirements on Chinese immigrants.   and the contributions of Chinese Americans to the establishment of the transcontinental railroad.   (2) The Legislature encourages all state and local professional development activities to provide teachers with content background and resources to assist them in teaching about additional laws that were enacted to perpetuate the discrimination against, and unequal treatment of, Chinese and other minority groups, including numerous antimiscegenation laws that prohibited marriage between white women and men of minority background or ancestry; the Alien Land Law of 1913, which prohibited "aliens ineligible for citizenship" from owning land or property; the Cable Act of 1922, which terminated the United States citizenship of any woman who married an alien ineligible for United States citizenship; and the Immigration Act of 1924, which limited the number of immigrants who could be admitted from any country and prohibited the immigration of all Asians.   (3) The Chinese Exclusion Act of 1882, the Geary Act of 1892, and the other laws identified in paragraph (2) shall be considered in the next cycle in which the history-social science curriculum framework and its accompanying instructional materials are adopted.   (2) When the state board revises and adopts the curriculum framework for history-social science on or after January 1, 2017, the state board shall consider providing for the inclusion, in that curriculum framework, evaluation criteria, and accompanying instructional materials, of instruction on the Chinese Exclusion Act of 1882 and the contributions of Chinese Americans to the establishment of the transcontinental railroad.  (g) When the history-social science curriculum framework is revised as required by law, the Instructional Quality Commission shall consider including the Armenian, Cambodian, Darfur, and Rwandan genocides in the recommended history-social science curriculum framework. (h) The Model Curriculum for Human Rights and Genocide adopted by the state board, pursuant to Section 51226, shall be made available to schools in grades 7 to 12, inclusive, as soon as funding is available for this purpose. In addition, the department shall make the curriculum available on its Internet Web site. (i) For purposes of this article, "Armenian Genocide" means the torture, starvation, and murder of 1,500,000 Armenians, which included death marches into the Syrian desert, by the rulers of the Ottoman Turkish Empire and the exile of more than 500,000 innocent people during the period from 1915 to 1923, inclusive. (j) When the state board revises and adopts the curriculum framework for history-social science on or after January 1, 2016, the state board shall consider providing for the inclusion, in that curriculum framework, evaluation criteria, and accompanying instructional materials, of instruction on the unconstitutional deportation to Mexico during the Great Depression of citizens and lawful permanent residents of the United States. (k) As used in subdivisions (b) and (c), "human rights" and "human rights violations" include the unconstitutional deportation to Mexico during the Great Depression of citizens and lawful permanent residents of the United States.