California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB294 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/26/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 294ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 20, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 15, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 21, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 23, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Lackey and Steinorth (Coauthors: Assembly Members Olsen and Wilk) (Coauthors: Senators Huff, Runner, and Vidak) FEBRUARY 12, 2015 An act to add Part 0.5 (commencing with Section 135) to Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Division 3.5 (commencing with Section 3500) to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health and human services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 294, Lackey. Health and human services: state plans: federal waivers: public notice. Existing law establishes the California Health and Human Services Agency, and includes within that agency, the State Department of Social Services, the Department of Public Health, and the Department of Health Care Services, among other departments. This bill would require a department within the agency that has received approval of an operational state plan by a federal agency, or that has applied and has been approved for a waiver from a federal law or federal regulation, to make any and all approved plans and waivers available to the public by publishing a hyperlink to that information on the homepage of the department's Internet Web site. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Part 0.5 (commencing with Section 135) is added to Division 1 of the Health and Safety Code, to read: PART 0.5. California Health and Human Services Agency Departments: Public Notice Requirements 135. If a department within the California Health and Human Services Agency has received approval of an operational state plan by a federal agency, or has applied and has been approved for a waiver from a federal law or federal regulation, the department shall make any and all approved plans and waivers available to the public by publishing a hyperlink to that information on the homepage of the department's Internet Web site. SEC. 2. Division 3.5 (commencing with Section 3500) is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: DIVISION 3.5. California Health and Human Services Agency Departments: Public Notice Requirements 3500. If a department within the California Health and Human Services Agency has received approval of an operational state plan by a federal agency, or has applied and has been approved for a waiver from a federal law or federal regulation, the department shall make any and all approved plans and waivers available to the public by publishing a hyperlink to that information on the homepage of the department's Internet Web site.