California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB388 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/01/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 388AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Chang (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Baker, Brough, Lopez, and Maienschein) (Coauthors: Senators  Bates     and Huff   Bates,   Huff,   and Runner  ) FEBRUARY 18, 2015 An act to amend Section 50408 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 388, as amended, Chang. Housing:  homeless  veterans:  supportive and transitional housing:  reports. Existing law requires the Department of Housing and Community Development to submit an annual report to the Governor and both houses of the Legislature on the operations and accomplishments during the previous fiscal year of the housing programs administered by the department. Existing law requires the report to include, among other things, an evaluation, in collaboration with the Department of Veterans Affairs, of any program established by the department pursuant to the Veterans Housing and Homeless Prevention Act of 2014. This bill would additionally require the evaluation to include information relating to the effectiveness  of assisted programs  in helping  homeless veterans of any organization   veterans occupying any supportive housing or tr   ansitional housing development  that was issued funds pursuant to that act, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. It is the intent of the Legislature in enacting the changes to Section 50408 of the Health and Safety Code made by Section 2 of this act to ensure that entities that are receiving funds through the administration of Proposition 41, the California Veterans Housing and Homeless Prevention Bond Act of 2014, are using them in the most effective manner possible to prevent veteran homelessness and to aid those impoverished veterans who are already residing in homelessness. The inclusion of this study would ensure that the Legislature will have adequate data to assess the viability of the program as well as to give the California Department of Veterans Affairs a means by which to determine the viability of nonprofits that serve veterans and assess their worthiness in the program. SEC. 2. Section 50408 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 50408. (a) On or before December 31 of each year, the department shall submit an annual report to the Governor and both houses of the Legislature on the operations and accomplishments during the previous fiscal year of the housing programs administered by the department, including, but not limited to, the Emergency Housing and Assistance Program and Community Development Block Grant activity. (b) The report shall include all of the following information: (1) The number of units assisted by those programs. (2) The number of individuals and households served and their income levels. (3) The distribution of units among various areas of the state. (4) The amount of other public and private funds leveraged by the assistance provided by those programs. (5) Information detailing the assistance provided to various groups of persons by programs that are targeted to assist those groups. (6) The information required to be reported pursuant to Section 17031.8. (7) (A) An evaluation, in collaboration with the Department of Veterans Affairs, of any program established by the department pursuant to Article 3.2 (commencing with Section 987.001) of Chapter 6 of Division 4 of the Military and Veterans Code, including information relating to the effectiveness  of assisted programs  in helping  low-income homeless veterans of any organization   veterans occupying any supportive housing or transitional housing development  that was issued funds pursuant to that article. (B) The evaluation shall include, but is not limited to, the following information: (i) Performance outcome data including, but not limited to, housing stability, housing exit information,  and  tenant  satisfaction as   satisfaction, which may be  measured by a survey, and changes in income, benefits, and education. (I) For purposes of this paragraph, the term "housing stability" includes, but is not limited to,  both of the following:   (ia)     How   how  many tenants  maintained   exit transitional housing to permanent housing or maintain permanent  housing, and the length of time those tenants spent in  housing.   assisted units.   (ib) How many tenants move on to other housing, excluding those tenants who move on for a higher level of care and those tenants who died during tenancy.  (II) For purposes of this paragraph, the term "housing exit information" includes, but is not limited to, the following: (ia) How many tenants left  housing.   assisted units.  (ib) The  dates those tenants left housing.   length of tenancy in assisted units.  (ic) The reason those tenants left  housing.   assisted units, when that information is readily obtainable.  (id)  Where tenants who have left housing find new housing.   The housing   status of a tenant exiting an assisted unit upon exit when that information is readily available.  (ii) Client data, which may include, but is not limited to, demographic characteristics of the veteran and his or her family, educational and employment status of the veteran, and veteran-specific information including, but not limited to, disability ratings, type of discharge, branch, era of service, and veterans affairs health care eligibility.