California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB40 Amended / Bill

Filed 09/02/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 40AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 15, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Ting and Levine  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Baker,   Chiu,   Dodd,   Lackey,   and Mark Stone   )   (   Coauthors:   Senators   Anderson,   Hill,   Leno,   McGuire,   Nguyen,   and Wolk   )  DECEMBER 1, 2014 An act to add  and repeal  Sections 27567, 30114, and 30814  to   of  the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 40, as amended, Ting. Toll bridges: pedestrians and bicycles. Existing law provides for the construction and operation of various toll bridges by the state, the Golden Gate Bridge, Highway and Transportation District, and  by  private entities that have entered into a franchise agreement with the state. This bill  would   would, until January 1, 2021,  prohibit a toll from being imposed on the passage of a pedestrian or bicycle over these various toll bridges. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 27567 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 27567.  (a)    No toll shall be imposed on the passage of a pedestrian or bicycle over any bridge that is under the jurisdiction of the district, on which the travel of pedestrians and bicycles is otherwise authorized.  (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2021, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2021, deletes or extends that date.  SEC. 2. Section 30114 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 30114.  (a)    No toll shall be imposed on the passage of a pedestrian or bicycle over any state-owned bridge, on which the travel of pedestrians and bicycles is otherwise authorized, and on which tolls are imposed on the passage of motor vehicles.  (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2021, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2021, deletes or extends that date.  SEC. 3. Section 30814 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 30814.  (a)    No toll shall be imposed on the passage of a pedestrian or bicycle over any bridge that is part of the state highway system, on which the travel of pedestrians and bicycles is otherwise authorized, and on which tolls are imposed on the passage of motor vehicles, including any bridge constructed pursuant to a franchise granted under this article.  (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2021, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2021, deletes or extends that date.