BILL NUMBER: AB 400AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 31, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 17, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Alejo FEBRUARY 19, 2015 An act to add Section 101.14 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highway signs. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 400, as amended, Alejo. Department of Transportation: changeable message signs. Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways. Existing law, the Outdoor Advertising Act, provides for the regulation by the department of advertising displays, as defined, within view of public highways. Existing law also authorizes the department to install and maintain information signs along state highways. This bill would require the department, by June 30, 2016, to update its internal policies to allow displays of safety, transportation-related, and voting-related messages on changeable message signs, as defined, subject to approval by the United States Department of Transportation, as provided. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 101.14 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 101.14. (a) Prior to June 30, 2016, and subject to federal approval as provided in subdivision (d), the department shall update its internal policies to allow displays of the following types of messages on changeable message signs: (1) Safety messages. (2) Transportation-related messages. (3) Reminders to register tovote,vote, as requested by the Secretary of State, not more than14two days priortoto, and on thedeadline tolast day to, register to vote in a particular statewidegeneral, primary, or special election.general election, statewide primary election, or statewide special election conducted pursuant to the Elections Code. (4) Reminders tovotevote, as requested by the Secretary of State, as elections approach, not more than14two days priortoto, and on election day of, a particular statewidegeneral, primary, or special election.general election, statewide primary election, or statewide special election conducted pursuant to the Elections Code. (b) For purposes of this section, "changeable message sign" means any electronic sign on a roadway with a changeable message typically used to alert motorists of traffic conditions, unusual weather conditions, emergencies, or other events. (c) Nothing in this section shall be construed to alter the requirements of the Emergency Alert System, the Amber Plan under Section 8594 of the Government Code, or the Blue Alert System under Section 8594.5 of the Government Code. The departmentshallmay give priority to other messages, including, but not limited to, the display of emergency alerts, AmberAlerts, andAlerts, BlueAlertsAlerts, safety messages, and transportation-related messages, over the messages authorized pursuant to paragraph (3) or (4) of subdivision (a). (d) The department shall not display any information on a changeable message sign authorized pursuant to paragraph (3) or (4) of subdivision (a) unless the United States Department of Transportation, or any of its agencies, has expressly approved the display of that information. If the department is advised by the United States Department of Transportation, or any of its agencies, that the display of information otherwise authorized by paragraph (3) or (4) of subdivision (a) will result in the reduction of federal aid highway funds to the state pursuant to Section 131 of Title 23 of the United States Code, that display of information shall not be made.