California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB419 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/26/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 419AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Kim FEBRUARY 19, 2015 An act to  amend Section 6303 of the Government Code, relating to foreign trade zones.   add Section 12096.4.5 to the Government Code, relating to state government.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 419, as amended, Kim.  Foreign trade zones.   Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development: regulations.   The Economic Revitalization Act establishes the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development, also known as "GO-Biz," to serve the Governor as the lead entity for economic strategy and the marketing of California on issues relating to business development, private sector investment, and economic growth.   This bill would require GO-Biz to annually compile all regulations adopted by any state agency in the preceding year that affect any small business, as defined, and organize and report this information to the Legislature. This bill would make findings and declarations in this regard.   Existing law authorizes any public corporation and specified private corporations to apply for the privilege of establishing, operating, and maintaining a foreign-trade zone in accordance with specified provisions of federal law, and specifically authorizes a private corporation whose application is granted pursuant to those provisions of federal law to establish, operate, and maintain the foreign-trade zone, subject to specified conditions and restrictions.   This bill would make a nonsubstantive change to this provision.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   The Legislature finds and declares all of the following:   (a) The Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development, also known as GO-Biz, serves as the state's lead entity for economic strategy and the marketing of California on issues relating to business development, private sector investment, and economic growth. As part of that mission, the Office of Small Business Advocate is located within GO-Biz to serve as a liaison between the small business community and state government.   (b) The Office of Small Business Advocate recently reported to the Governor and the Legislature that it assists "hundreds of small businesses every year by providing information on the legal and regulatory requirements to start a business and help resolve conflicts between small business and government entities at the local, regional, state, and federal levels."   (c) The Office of Small Business Advocate, through its position within GO-Biz, manages the Interagency Working Group to promote information sharing between state departments on effective outreach strategies to reach small business and stay updated on regulatory changes that affect small businesses.   (d) GO-Biz, with the assistance of the Office of Small Business Advocate, is well placed to review all new regulations adopted by state entities that affect any small business and to efficiently and effectively report that information to the Legislature.   (e) The Legislature should be informed annually on the impact of new regulations adopted statewide on California's small business.   SEC. 2.   Section 12096.4.5 is added to the   Government Code   , to read:   12096.4.5. (a) On or before January 1, 2017, and annually thereafter, the office shall compile all regulations adopted by any state agency in the preceding year that affect any small business, as defined in Section 14837, and shall organize and report this information to the Legislature. (b) The office shall submit the reports required by subdivision (a) to the Legislature in compliance with Section 9795.  SECTION 1.   Section 6303 of the Government Code is amended to read: 6303. A private corporation organized under the laws of the state subsequent to September 15, 1935, for the purpose of establishing, operating and maintaining a foreign-trade zone in accordance with the act of Congress may make application for the privilege of establishing, operating, and maintaining a foreign-trade zone in accordance with the act of Congress.