California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB419 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/04/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 419AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 4, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Kim FEBRUARY 19, 2015 An act to add Section 12096.4.5 to the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 419, as amended, Kim. Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development: regulations. The Economic Revitalization Act establishes the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development, also known as "GO-Biz," to serve the Governor as the lead entity for economic strategy and the marketing of California on issues relating to business development, private sector investment, and economic growth. This bill would require GO-Biz to  annually compile all regulations adopted by any state agency in the preceding year that affect any small business, as defined, and organize and report this information to the Legislature. This bill would make findings and declarations in this regard   create a Web-access point on its Internet Web site and would require the Web   -access   point to include information about the state rulemaking process and a link to relevant information on the Internet Web site of the Office of Administrative Law, as specified  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) The Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development, also known as GO-Biz, serves as the state's lead entity for economic strategy and the marketing of California on issues relating to business development, private sector investment, and economic growth. As part of that mission, the Office of Small Business Advocate is located within GO-Biz to serve as a liaison between the small business community and state government. (b) The Office of Small Business Advocate recently reported to the Governor and the Legislature that it assists "hundreds of small businesses every year by providing information on the legal and regulatory requirements to start a business and help resolve conflicts between small business and government entities at the local, regional, state, and federal levels." (c) The Office of Small Business Advocate, through its position within GO-Biz, manages the Interagency Working Group to promote information sharing between state departments on effective outreach strategies to reach small business and stay updated on regulatory changes that affect small businesses. (d) GO-Biz, with the assistance of the Office of Small Business Advocate, is well placed to review all new regulations adopted by state entities that affect any small business and to efficiently and effectively report that information to the Legislature. (e) The Legislature should be informed annually on the impact of new regulations adopted statewide on California's small business.  SEC. 2.   Section 12096.4.5 is added to the Government Code, to read: 12096.4.5. (a) On or before January 1, 2017, and annually thereafter, the office shall compile all regulations adopted by any state agency in the preceding year that affect any small business, as defined in Section 14837, and shall organize and report this information to the Legislature. (b) The office shall submit the reports required by subdivision (a) to the Legislature in compliance with Section 9795.   SEC. 2.   Section 12096.4.5 is added to the   Government Code   , to read:  12096.4.5. (a) The office shall create a Web-access point on its Internet Web site. The Web-access point shall include information about the state rulemaking process and a link to relevant information on the Internet Web site of the Office of Administrative Law including, but not limited to, information found in the California Code of Regulations, the California Regulatory Notice Register, and the California Code of Regulations Supplement. Information on the office's Internet Web site shall assist a small business in understanding how to effectively find relevant information on pending and current regulations that may affect small businesses generally, as well as specific industry sectors. (b) The Web-access point shall be integrated into the office's existing Internet Web site as updates and enhancements are designed and implemented. The requirements of this section shall be met within the existing schedule for technology and programing upgrades. (c) Progress on the requirements of this section may be included in the annual report of the Office of Small Business Advocate.