California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB446 Amended / Bill

Filed 09/01/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 446AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ridley-Thomas FEBRUARY 23, 2015 An act to  repeal   amend  Section 32580 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the Baldwin Hills Conservancy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 446, as amended, Ridley-Thomas. Baldwin Hills Conservancy. The Baldwin Hills Conservancy Act establishes the Baldwin Hills Conservancy in the Natural Resources Agency to, among other things, acquire and manage public lands within the Baldwin Hills area, and provide recreational, open space, wildlife habitat restoration and protection, and lands for educational uses within the area. Existing law provides that the act will remain in effect until January 1, 2018. This bill would  eliminate the January 1, 2018, repeal date, thereby extending the operation of the act indefinitely.   extend the operation of the act until January 1, 2026.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 32580 of the   Public Resources Code   is amended to read:  32580. This division shall remain in effect only until January 1,  2018,   2026,  and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1,  2018,   2026,  deletes or extends that date.  SECTION 1.   Section 32580 of the Public Resources Code is repealed.