BILL NUMBER: AB 446ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 3, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ridley-Thomas FEBRUARY 23, 2015 An act to amend Section 32580 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the Baldwin Hills Conservancy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 446, Ridley-Thomas. Baldwin Hills Conservancy. The Baldwin Hills Conservancy Act establishes the Baldwin Hills Conservancy in the Natural Resources Agency to, among other things, acquire and manage public lands within the Baldwin Hills area, and provide recreational, open space, wildlife habitat restoration and protection, and lands for educational uses within the area. Existing law provides that the act will remain in effect until January 1, 2018. This bill would extend the operation of the act until January 1, 2026. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 32580 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 32580. This division shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2026, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2026, deletes or extends that date.