California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB464 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/17/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 464AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 17, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 6, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Mullin and Gordon (Coauthors: Assembly Members Frazier and McCarty) (Coauthors: Senators Allen and Hill) FEBRUARY 23, 2015 An act to amend Section 7251.1  of   of, and to add Section 7251.5 to,  the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 464, as amended, Mullin. Transactions and use taxes: maximum combined rate. Existing law authorizes cities and counties, and, if specifically authorized, other local governmental entities, subject to certain limitations and approval requirements, to levy a transactions and use tax for general purposes, in accordance with the procedures and requirements set forth in the Transactions and Use Tax Law, including a requirement that the combined rate of all taxes imposed in accordance with that law in the county not exceed 2%. This bill would increase that maximum combined rate to 3%. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 7251.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code is amended to read: 7251.1.  (a)    The combined rate of all taxes imposed in accordance with this part in any county shall not exceed  3   2  percent. A tax shall not be considered to be in accordance with this part if, upon its adoption, the combined rate in the county will exceed  3   2  percent.  (b) This section applies only to taxes and rates authorized to be imposed in accordance with this part in any county before January 1, 2016. On and after January 1, 2016, the combined rate in the county shall not exceed the combined rate established in Section 7251.5.   SEC. 2.   Section 7251.5 is added to the   Revenue and Taxation Code   , to read:   7251.5. On and after January 1, 2016, the combined rate of all taxes imposed in accordance with this part in any county shall not exceed 3 percent. A tax shall not be considered to be in accordance with this part if, upon its adoption, the combined rate in the county will exceed 3 percent.