California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB572 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/16/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 572AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 8, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Beth Gaines (Coauthors: Assembly Members Chvez, Cristina Garcia,  and Gonzalez   Gonzalez,   and Ridley-Thomas  ) FEBRUARY 24, 2015 An act to add Article 1 (commencing with Section 104250) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to diabetes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 572, as amended, Beth Gaines. California Diabetes Program. Existing law establishes the State Department of Public Health and sets forth its powers and duties pertaining to, among other things, protecting, preserving, and advancing public health, including disseminating information regarding diseases. This bill would require the State Department of Public Health to develop a detailed action plan for the prevention and treatment of diabetes, and to submit a report to the Legislature by  an unspecified date   January 1, 2018,  that includes an update on the status of the plan and the progress of plan objectives and outcomes. The bill would also make related findings and declarations. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Article 1 (commencing with Section 104250) is added to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 103 of the Health and Safety Code, to read: Article 1. Diabetes. 104250. The Legislature finds and declares all of the following: (a) It is reported that one in seven adult Californians has diabetes, and the numbers are rising rapidly. The actual number of those whose lives are affected by diabetes is unknown and stands to be much higher when factoring in the incidence of type 1 diabetes and undiagnosed gestational diabetes. (b) California has the greatest number of annual new cases of diabetes in the United States. (c) The incidence of diabetes amongst all Californians has increased 32 percent over the past decade. (d) Over 11.4 million people in California have prediabetes, a condition that is a precursor to full onset type 2 diabetes. This suggests that the total population of those diagnosed will continue to rise in the absence of interventions. (e) The prevalence of diagnosed gestational diabetes in California has increased 60 percent in just seven years, from 3.3 percent of hospital deliveries in 1998 to 5.3 percent of hospital deliveries in 2005, with the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention stating that the diagnosis rate could run as high as 18.3 percent. (f) The fiscal impact to the State of California, including total health care and related costs for the treatment of diabetes, was over $35.9 billion in 2010. (g) A recent study of a large state with a sizable diabetes population found that the rate of diagnosed diabetes in that state's Medicaid population is nearly double that of its general population. (h) There is no cure for any type of diabetes. (i) Diabetes when left untreated can lead to serious and costly complications and a reduced lifespan. (j) Many of these serious complications can be delayed or avoided with timely diagnosis, effective patient self-care, and improved social awareness. (k) It is the intent of the Legislature to require the State Department of Public Health to provide to the Legislature information, including the annual federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention progress report, on diabetes prevention and control activities conducted by the State Department of Public Health and expenditures associated with diabetes prevention and control activities. These activities are set forth by the State Department of Public Health in the California Wellness Plan 2014 and the report dated September 2014 entitled "Burden of Diabetes in California." 104251. (a) The State Department of Public Health shall develop a detailed action plan for the prevention and treatment of diabetes in the state. The plan shall include, at a minimum, all of the following items: (1) Priorities and performance measures that are based upon evidence-based strategies to prevent or control diabetes. The plan shall also identify expected outcomes of the action steps proposed and establish benchmarks for controlling and preventing relevant forms of diabetes. (2) An analysis of the financial impact on the state of all types of diabetes. This assessment shall include the number of persons living with diabetes, the number of family members affected by diabetes, the financial impact diabetes and its complications have on the state, and the financial impact of diabetes in comparison to other chronic diseases and conditions. (3) A summary of expenditures  by the department  on programs and activities aimed at preventing or controlling diabetes. (4) A summary of the amount and source of any funding directed to the department for programs and activities aimed at controlling or preventing diabetes. (5) A description of the existing level of coordination between state departments and entities with regard to activities, programmatic activities, and the provision of information to the public regarding managing, treating, and preventing all forms of diabetes and its complications. (6) A detailed budget blueprint identifying needs, costs, and resources required to implement the plan. This blueprint shall include a budget range for each action step identified. (7) Policy recommendations for the prevention and treatment of diabetes. (b) The plan may revise the priorities and performance measures previously set forth as part of the California Wellness Plan, the Burden of Diabetes in California report, or other diabetes prevention programs within the State Department of Public Health. (c) The State Department of Public Health shall submit a report to the Legislature on or before  ______   January 1, 2018  , and biennially thereafter, that includes an update on the status of the plan and the progress of plan objectives and outcomes. The report shall additionally include recommendations for improving the plan based upon activities and findings to date. The State Department of Public Health shall make the report and any updates issued pursuant to this section available on its Internet Web site. (d) (1) The requirement for submitting a report imposed under subdivision (c) is inoperative on  ____, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code.   January 1, 2024.  (2) The report submitted to the Legislature pursuant to this section shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.