California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB606 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/13/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 606AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Levine FEBRUARY 24, 2015 An act to add Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 14714) to Chapter 2 of Part 5.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state property. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 606, as amended, Levine. Water conservation. Existing law requires the Department of General Services to provide planning, acquisition, construction, and maintenance of state buildings and  property.   property, and maintain a statewide property inventory of all real property held by the state.  Existing law requires the department, in consultation with the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, and with the concurrence of the Department of Finance, to identify each public building in the department's state property inventory where it is feasible for that building to reduce energy consumption and achieve energy efficiencies, as specified, and make retrofits, as specified. This bill  would require   would, when  the Department of General Services  replaces landscaping or irrigation on public property or when new public property is added to the department's statewide property inventory, require the department  to  identify each public property added to the department's state property inventory beginning January 1, 2015, where it is feasible for   reduce  water consumption  to be reduced  and  increase  water efficiencies  to be achieved   for that property, where feasible,  through replacement of landscaping, irrigation timers, or spray sprinkler heads,  implementation of recycled water irrigation, or any combination  thereof, and would require the appropriate replacements where feasible, except as specified.   thereof.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 14714) is added to Chapter 2 of Part 5.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, to read: Article 6.5. State Property Water Use 14714. (a)  The   When the  department  shall identify each   replaces landscaping or irrigation on public property or when new  public property  that  is added to the department's  state   statewide  property  inventory beginning January 1, 2016, including, but not limited to, property managed by the Department of Transportation,   inventory, the department shall reduce water consumption and increase water efficiencies for that property,  where  it is feasible for water consumption to be reduced and water efficiencies to be achieved   feasible,  through any or all of the following: (1) Replacement of landscaping with  drought tolerant   drought-tolerant  plants with an emphasis on native plant species. (2) Replacement of irrigation timers to permit efficient watering schedules. (3) Replacement of spray sprinkler heads with bubblers, drip irrigation, and soaker hoses.  (b) The department shall make the appropriate replacements for each public property identified pursuant to subdivision (a) to reduce overall water consumption where feasible, except that work   (4) Implementation of recycled water irrigation.   (b)     Work  on public property of the California State University shall be subject to the consent of the California State University. (c) For purposes of this section,  "feasible"   the following terms have the following meanings:   (1)     "Feasible"  means capable of being accomplished in a successful manner within a reasonable period of time, taking into account life-cycle cost analyses, and environmental, social,  historical,  and technological factors.  (2) "Public property" means property managed by the department or the Department of Transportation.