BILL NUMBER: AB 679AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 18, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 25, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 18, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Travis Allen FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to amend Section 27320 of the Government Code, relating to local government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 679, as amended, Travis Allen. Documents: recordation. Existing law requires the recorder of each county, upon payment of proper fees and taxes, to accept for recordation any instrument, paper, or notice that is authorized or required by law to be recorded. Existing law further requires the recorder, when any instrument authorized by law to be recorded is deposited in the recorder's office for record, to endorse upon the instrument in the order in which it is deposited, the year, month, day, hour, and minute of its reception,andthe amount of feesfor recording.recording, and the name of the person at whose request it is recorded. This bill would delete the requirement that the recorder endorse the name of the person at whose request an instrument is recorded and would additionally require the recorder to endorse upon the instrument the number of pages of the instrument. By imposing new duties upon the county recorder, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 27320 of the Government Code is amended to read: 27320. When any instrument authorized by law to be recorded is deposited in the recorder's office for record, the recorder shall endorse upon it in the order in which it is deposited, the year, month, day, hour, and minute of its reception, its number of pages, and the amount of fees for recording. The recorder shall record it without delay, together with the acknowledgments, proofs, certificates, and prior recording data written upon or annexed to it, with the plats, surveys, schedules, and other papers thereto annexed, and shall note on the record its identificationnumber, and the name of the person at whose request it is recorded.number. Efforts shall be made to assign identification numbers sequentially, but an assignment of a nonsequential number may be made if not in violation of express recording instructions regarding a group of concurrently recorded instruments and if, in the discretion of the county recorder, such assignment best serves the interest of expeditious recording. SEC. 2. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because a local agency or school district has the authority to levy service charges, fees, or assessments sufficient to pay for the program or level of service mandated by this act, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code.