California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB773 Amended / Bill

Filed 09/01/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 773AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 1, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 21, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Baker FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to amend  Sections 2423 and 2982 of, to add Section 2499.7 to, and to repeal Section 2422 of,   Section 2982 of  the Business and Professions Code, relating to business and professions. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 773, as amended, Baker.  Licenses: Medical Board of California:  Board of  Psychology.   Psychology: licenses.   Existing law provides for the licensure and regulation of specific health care professions by the Medical Board of California or a licensing and regulatory authority within the jurisdiction of that board. The Medical Practice Act determines the expiration of, and governs the renewal of, certificates, licenses, registrations, and permits issued by or under the Medical Board of California. Under the act, physician and surgeon's certificates, certificates to practice podiatric medicine, registrations of spectacle lens dispensers and contact lens dispensers, and certificates to practice midwifery expire on the last day of the birth month of the licensee during the 2nd year of a 2-year term. Under that act, registrations of dispensing opticians expire on the last day of the month in which the license was issued during the 2nd year of a 2-year term. The Psychology Licensing Law establishes the Board of Psychology to license and regulate the practice of psychology. Under that law, psychology licenses expire on the legal birth date of the licensee during the 2nd year of a 2-year term. This bill would instead have  the above licenses, with the exception of certificates to practice podiatric medicine,   those licenses  expire at the end, as provided, of a 2-year period from the date the license was issued. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 2422 of the Business and Professions Code is repealed.   SEC. 2.   Section 2423 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 2423. (a) All physician and surgeon's certificates, registrations of dispensing opticians, spectacle lens dispensers, and contact lens dispensers, and certificates to practice midwifery shall expire at 12 midnight on the last day of the month in which the license was issued during the second year of a two-year term commencing from the date of issuance. (b) To renew an unexpired license, the licensee, on or before the date on which it would otherwise expire, shall apply for renewal on a form prescribed by the licensing authority and pay the prescribed renewal fee.   SEC. 3.   Section 2499.7 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 2499.7. (a) Certificates to practice podiatric medicine shall expire at 12 midnight on the last day of the birth month of the licensee during the second year of a two-year term. (b) To renew an unexpired certificate, the licensee, on or before the date on which it would otherwise expire, shall apply for renewal on a form prescribed by the board and pay the prescribed renewal fee.   SEC. 4.  SECTION 1.  Section 2982 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 2982. (a) All licenses expire and become invalid at 12 midnight on the last day of February, 1980, and thereafter shall expire at 12 midnight of the last date of the two-year period from the date the license was issued. (b) To renew an unexpired license, the licensee, on or before the date on which it would otherwise expire, shall apply for renewal on a form provided by the board, accompanied by the prescribed renewal fee.