BILL NUMBER: AB 779AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 2, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 2, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 14, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Cristina Garcia FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to add Section 53909 to the Government Code, relating to local government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 779, as amended, Cristina Garcia. Local government: financial disclosures. Existing law requires a local agency, if it is required to report specified information to the Controller and if it maintains an Internet Web site, to post, in a conspicuous location on its Internet Web site, information on the annual compensation of its elected officials, officers, and employees, as specified. This bill would require a city, county, city and county, or special district district, on or before April 30 of each year, to post a link on the homepage of its Internet Web site to a page that contains the names, positions, and total compensation, including a breakdown of the types of compensation provided, of each elected official within that entity for the previous fiscal year and the 10 employees with the greatest total compensation, as specified. Calendar year. By increasing the duties of local officials, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 53909 is added to the Government Code, to read: 53909. (a) A city, county, city and county, or special district shall, within six months of the close of the fiscal year, on or before April 30 of each year, post a link on the homepage of its Internet Web site to a page that contains the names, positions, and total compensation, including a breakdown of the types of compensation provided, of each elected official within that entity for the previous fiscal year and the 10 employees with the greatest total compensation, determined pursuant to subdivision (b). calendar year. If a city or special district does not have an Internet Web site, it shall work with the relevant county to post the compile this information on the county's Internet Web site. and make that information readily available upon request. (b) The city, county, city and county, or special district shall aggregate the total compensation for an employee, including all positions held by that employee during the fiscal year, to determine the 10 employees with the greatest total compensation. (c) (b) For purposes of this section "total compensation" includes payments for salaries, overtime, unused vacation time, stipends, pension contributions, retirement contributions, health premium contributions, automobile allowances, phone allowances, and technology allowances. Any other type of compensation that the city, county, city and county, or special district provides shall also be included and specified. "Total compensation" does not include reimbursements or payments for work-related travel expenses. SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.