California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB793 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/16/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 793AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Quirk FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to amend Section 2790 of, and to add Section 8365 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 793, as amended, Quirk. Energy efficiency. (1) Under existing law, the Public Utilities Commission has regulatory authority over public utilities, including electrical corporations and gas corporations, as defined. Existing law requires the commission to require an electrical or gas corporation to perform home weatherization services for low-income  customers,   customers  if the commission determines that a significant need for those services exists in the corporation's service territory. For these purposes, existing law authorizes weatherization, where feasible, to include certain measures for a dwelling unit. Existing law also authorizes weatherization, for these purposes, to include other measures determined by the commission to be feasible, taking into consideration the cost-effectiveness of the measures as a whole and the policy of reducing energy-related hardships facing low-income households. This bill would require weatherization, for the above-specified purposes, to include  home  energy management technology, as defined, determined by the commission to be feasible, taking into consideration the above-described factors. (2) Existing law requires the commission, by July 1, 2010, and in consultation with the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, the Independent System Operator, and other key stakeholders, to determine the requirements for a smart grid deployment plan consistent with specified policies and federal law. Existing law requires each electrical corporation, by July 1, 2011, to develop and submit a smart grid deployment plan to the commission for approval. This bill would require the commission to require each electrical corporation to develop and implement a plan to educate its residential and  small  business customers  whose homes or places of business are equipped with an advanced meter about how they can use data from the advanced meter  to better understand and control their use of electricity. The bill would require the commission to require each electrical corporation to develop  a rebate   an incentive  program to  reimburse   provide incentives to  a residential or  small  business customer  , as prescribed, who purchases   who acquires  energy management technology for use in the customer's home or place of business.  The bill would require the commission to require each electrical corporation to annually report to the commission on actual customer savings resulting from the education plan and the incentive program.  (3) Because a violation of any part of any order, decision, rule, direction, demand, or requirement of the Public Utilities Commission is a crime, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2790 of the Public Utilities Code is amended to read: 2790. (a) The commission shall require an electrical or gas corporation to perform home weatherization services for low-income customers, as determined by the commission under Section 739, if the commission determines that a significant need for those services exists in the corporation's service territory, taking into consideration both the cost-effectiveness of the services and the policy of reducing the hardships facing low-income households. (b) (1) For purposes of this section, "weatherization" may include, where feasible, any of the following measures for any dwelling unit: (A) Attic insulation. (B) Caulking. (C) Weatherstripping. (D) Low flow showerhead. (E) Waterheater blanket. (F) Door and building envelope repairs that reduce air infiltration. (2) The commission shall direct any electrical or gas corporation to provide as many of these measures as are feasible for each eligible low-income dwelling unit. (c) "Weatherization" may also include other building conservation measures,  home  energy management technology, energy-efficient appliances, and energy education programs determined by the commission to be feasible, taking into consideration for all measures both the cost-effectiveness of the measures as a whole and the policy of reducing energy-related hardships facing low-income households. (d) Weatherization programs shall use the needs assessment pursuant to Section 382.1 to maximize efficiency of delivery.  (e) For purposes of this section, the following terms have the following meanings:   (1) "Home energy   (e)     For purposes of this section, "energy  management technology" is a  product or service   product, service, or software,  that allows a customer to better understand and manage energy use in the customer's  home and may include, but is not limited to, a home energy monitor.   home.   (2) "Home energy monitor" is a device that is able to provide household electricity consumption in real-time by connecting to an advanced meter equipped with home area network functionality.  SEC. 2. Section 8365 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 8365. (a) The commission shall require each electrical corporation to do the following: (1) Develop and implement a plan by June 30, 2016, to educate its residential customers and  small  business customers  whose homes or places of business are equipped with an advanced meter about how they can use data from the advanced meter  to better understand and control their use of electricity. The plan shall include notification of the  rebate   incentive  program developed pursuant to paragraph (2).  (2) Develop a rebate program no later than June 30, 2016, to reimburse a residential customer or small business customer who purchases energy management technology for use in the customer's home or place of business. The rebate shall be an amount equal to ___ percent of the retail value of the product or service, not to exceed ___.   (2) Develop a program no later than June 30, 2016, to provide incentives to a residential or business customer who acquires energy management technology for use in the customer's home or place of business. The electrical corporation shall allow third parties or local governments to apply for incentives on behalf of customers. The electrical corporation shall work with third parties, local governments, and other interested parties in developing the program. The electrical corporation shall establish incentive amounts at a level necessary to encourage adoption of energy management technologies that allow a customer to achieve progressively higher savings.   (3) Annually report to the commission on actual customer savings resulting from the education plan and the incentive program established pursuant to this section.   (b) For purposes of this section, the following terms have the following meanings:   (1) "Energy   (b)     For purposes of this section, "energy  management technology" is a  product or service   product, service, or software  that allows a customer to better understand and manage electricity use in the customer's home or place of  business and may include, but is not limited to, an energy monitor.   business.   (2) "Energy monitor" is a device that is able to provide electricity consumption in real-time or near real-time by connecting to an advanced meter equipped with home area network functionality.  SEC. 3. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.