California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB935 Amended / Bill

Filed 09/04/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 935AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 4, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 16, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 23, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Salas  (   Principal coauthor:   Senator   Galgiani   )  (Coauthors: Assembly Members Atkins, Bigelow, Gray, Olsen, Perea, and Rendon) (Coauthors: Senators Berryhill, Cannella, Fuller,  Galgiani,  and Vidak) FEBRUARY 26, 2015 An act to add Section 140 to the Water Code, relating to water. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 935, as amended, Salas. Water projects. Existing law establishes in the Natural Resources Agency the Department of Water Resources, which manages and undertakes planning with regard to water resources in the state. This bill would require, upon appropriation by the Legislature, the department to provide funding for certain  projects.   projects, provided that certain conditions are met.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 140 is added to the Water Code, to read: 140.  (a)    Upon appropriation by the Legislature,  which shall not exceed seventy-five million dollars ($75,000,000) total,  the department shall provide funding for the following  projects:   projects if the project satisfies the conditions described in subdivision (c):   (a)   (1)  A project that substantially conforms to the project description for the Reverse Flow Pump-back Facilities on the Friant-Kern Canal Restoration Project set forth by the draft investment strategy released by the San Joaquin River Restoration Program in December 2014.  (b)   (2)  A project that substantially conforms to the project description for the San Joaquin River Recapture at Patterson Irrigation District Conveyed through Delta-Mendota Canal to San Luis Reservoir Project set forth by the draft investment strategy released by the San Joaquin River Restoration Program in December 2014.  (b) Funding pursuant to this section shall not exceed 80 percent of the total cost of the project.   (c) The projects identified in this section shall not be eligible for funding pursuant to subdivision (a) until all of the following requirements are met:   (1) All feasibility studies are complete and draft environmental impact reports are available for public review.   (2) The director receives commitments for not less than 75 percent of the nonstate cost share requirement of the project.   (d) A project funded pursuant to this section shall be subject to all of the following:   (1) The project shall comply with the requirements of Title X of Public Law 111-11.   (2) The project shall comply with any other applicable provisions of state and federal law.   (3) To the extent the project is used in furtherance of paragraph (4) of subdivision (a) of Section 10004 of Title X of Public Law 111-11, that use shall be made proportionally available to all entities subject to subdivision (a) of Section 10010 of Public Law 111-11.   (4) The project shall not result in any additional regulation of the State Water Project's Bank Pumping Plant or the federal Central Valley Project's Jones Pumping Plant, as compared to operation before the implementation of Title X of Public law 111-11.